Pogorzelska v. Ballenger et al
Plaintiff: Erika Pogorzelska
Defendant: Eric Ballenger and VanderCook College of Music
Case Number: 1:2019cv05683
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Motion for extension of time #7 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to the complaint by 10/30/2019. Motion hearing date of 10/10/2019 is stricken. Status hearing set for 10/31/2019 is stricken and reset to 11/21/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 (Unopposed) NOTICE of Motion by Molly E. Thompson for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/10/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Thompson, Molly)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant VanderCook College of Music for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (unopposed) (Thompson, Molly)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant VanderCook College of Music by Molly E. Thompson (Thompson, Molly)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant VanderCook College of Music by Ian Matthew Sherman (Sherman, Ian)
September 10, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Eric Ballenger, VanderCook College of Music. (lw, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erika Pogorzelska by Jeffrey R. Kulwin (Kulwin, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 10/31/2019 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
August 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Erika Pogorzelska by Rachel Anne Katz (Katz, Rachel)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Erika Pogorzelska; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16168855. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kulwin, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pogorzelska v. Ballenger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Ballenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VanderCook College of Music
Represented By: Ian Matthew Sherman
Represented By: Molly E. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Pogorzelska
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Kulwin
Represented By: Rachel Anne Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?