N.S. v Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Plaintiff: Meg S, N S and N.S.
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2019cv05699
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 9/3/2019: For the reasons stated below, Plaintiff's motion to enforce the stay-put injunction #5 is denied and the case is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. Civil case terminated. [For further details see Statement]. Mailed notice(is, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff's motion to enforce statutory stay-put injunction #5 is denied. Order to follow. Mailed notice (is, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion hearing held on 8/28/2019 regarding Plaintiffs' emergency motion to enforce statutory stay-put injunction #5 . Mailed notice (is, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE by Board of Education of the City of Chicagoin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Meg S, N S to enforce Statutory Stay-Put Injunction #5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Gibbons, Kathleen)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Board of Education of the City of Chicago by Kathleen Marie Gibbons (Gibbons, Kathleen)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2019 at 11:30 AM. as to Plaintiffs' emergency motion to enforce statutory stay-put injunction #5 . Mailed notice (is, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Correction regarding minute entry #7 . (ym, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 ENTERED In Error. Modified on 8/26/2019 (ym, ).
August 26, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Bradley Joseph Dembs for presentment of motion to enforce #5 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 8/29/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Dembs, Bradley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiffs Meg S, N S to enforce Statutory Stay-Put Injunction (Dembs, Bradley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Meg S, N S by Bradley Joseph Dembs (Dembs, Bradley)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Meg S, N S by Matthew David Cohen (Cohen, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cohen, Matthew)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by N S, Meg S; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16171450. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L)(Cohen, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.S. v Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meg S
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N S
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.S.
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Dembs
Represented By: Matthew David Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Chicago
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?