United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $122,000 in United States currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $122,000 in United States currency
Claimant: Stephen M. Komie and Christopher M Duncan
Case Number: 1:2019cv05757
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:0881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 CLAIM by Stephen M. Komie regarding complaint #1 Verified (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Assignment, #2 Certificate of Service)(Komie, Stephen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Stephen M. Komie by Stephen M. Komie (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Komie, Stephen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 8 CLAIM by Christopher M Duncan regarding complaint #1 Verified (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Komie, Stephen)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Christopher M Duncan by Stephen M. Komie (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Komie, Stephen)
October 6, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 10/31/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant / claimant who has not yet appeared by counsel. (mk)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 WARRANT Returned Executed by U.S. Marshal's Office as to Funds in the amount of $122,000.00 in United States Currency. (nsf, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued as to Funds in the amount of $122,000. (nsf, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION of Michael Joseph Kelly as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff United States of America (Kelly, Michael)
August 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kelly, Michael)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by United States of America; (Kelly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Funds in the amount of $122,000 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funds in the amount of $122,000 in United States currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Joseph Kelly
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Stephen M. Komie
Represented By: Stephen M. Komie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Christopher M Duncan
Represented By: Stephen M. Komie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?