Tawech et al v. Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Tyler and David Tawech
Defendant: Andrew Dale Ledbetter, Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. and Dale Ledbetter
Case Number: 1:2019cv05825
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Pursuant to stipulation to dismiss #7 , this action is dismissed pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(ii) without prejudice and without costs to any party. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Loftus, Alexander)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 10/31/2019 at 1:30 PM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 10/24/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
August 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Andrew Dale Ledbetter by Jeremy Craig Kleinman (Kleinman, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kleinman, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from 18th Judicial Circuit Court DuPage County, case number (2019L000927) filed by Andrew Dale Ledbetter Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16189492. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kleinman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tawech et al v. Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Tyler
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Tawech
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Dale Ledbetter
Represented By: Jeremy Craig Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Ledbetter
Represented By: Jeremy Craig Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?