Shealy et al v. American Alternative Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Teta, Jeffrey Schroen, Barbara Bishop, Terry Hardt, David Eberhard, Marilyn and James Brock, Vladimir Tsimberg, Robert Webb, Robert Sajdak, Gerald Gross, Bert and Cynthia Garnsey, Bonnie Greer, Steven Ziolkowski, Diane Zwicker, Lillian Powers, John Damas, Michelle Piasny, Mary Geraci, Christopher Shealy, Jeff Rutter, Patrica and Gary Davis and Annette Dorsey
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. and Andrew Dale Ledbetter
Case Number: 1:2019cv05827
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon receipt of the parties' stipulation of dismissal #13 pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), all future hearings and deadlines are stricken and all pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (air, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Loftus, Alexander)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held and continued to 9/27/19 at 10:00 a.m. By agreement, the Court defers any action on the plaintiffs' motion for remand #6 until further order. Mailed notice (air, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A. by William B. Oberts (Oberts, William)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Alternative Insurance Corporation by Alfred L. Buchanan (Buchanan, Alfred)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Barbara Bishop, Marilyn and James Brock, John Damas, Patrica and Gary Davis, Annette Dorsey, David Eberhard, Bert and Cynthia Garnsey, Mary Geraci, Bonnie Greer, Gerald Gross, Terry Hardt, Michelle Piasny, Lillian Powers, Jeff Rutter, Robert Sajdak, Jeffrey Schroen, Christopher Shealy, Michael Teta, Vladimir Tsimberg, Robert Webb, Steven Ziolkowski, Diane Zwicker by Joseph Robert Wojciechowski (Wojciechowski, Joseph)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Alternative Insurance Corporation by Thomas J. Lester (Lester, Thomas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motion by Alexander Nicholas Loftus for presentment of motion to remand, #6 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 9/4/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Loftus, Alexander)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Barbara Bishop, Marilyn and James Brock, John Damas, Patrica and Gary Davis, Annette Dorsey, David Eberhard, Bert and Cynthia Garnsey, Mary Geraci, Bonnie Greer, Gerald Gross, Terry Hardt, Michelle Piasny, Lillian Powers, Jeff Rutter, Robert Sajdak, Jeffrey Schroen, Christopher Shealy, Michael Teta, Vladimir Tsimberg, Robert Webb, Steven Ziolkowski, Diane Zwicker to remand (Loftus, Alexander)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (nsf, )
August 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Andrew Dale Ledbetter by Jeremy Craig Kleinman (Kleinman, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kleinman, Jeremy)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Chancery Division, case number (2019CH08938) filed by Andrew Dale Ledbetter Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16189804. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kleinman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shealy et al v. American Alternative Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Teta
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Schroen
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Bishop
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hardt
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Eberhard
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn and James Brock
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Tsimberg
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Webb
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sajdak
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Gross
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bert and Cynthia Garnsey
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Greer
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Ziolkowski
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Zwicker
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Powers
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Damas
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Piasny
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Geraci
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Shealy
Represented By: Alexander Nicholas Loftus
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Rutter
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrica and Gary Davis
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Dorsey
Represented By: Joseph Robert Wojciechowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Thomas J. Lester
Represented By: Alfred L. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kopelowitz Ostrow, P.A.
Represented By: William B. Oberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Dale Ledbetter
Represented By: Jeremy Craig Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?