Graf v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marina Graf
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv05881
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Rule 16(b) status hearing held on 11/1/2019 with attorneys for both sides. Motion by defendant for extension of time to answer #9 is granted; hearing date of 11/6/2019 is vacated. Response to complaint is to be filed by 12/5/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are to be made by 12/5/2019. Status hearing is continued to 12/13/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey Scott Nowak for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #9 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 11/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Nowak, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Allstate Insurance Company for extension of time to file answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and to Continue November 1, 2019 Status Hearing (Uncontested) (Nowak, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Allstate Insurance Company and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Nowak, Jeffrey)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Allstate Insurance Company by Jeffrey Scott Nowak (Nowak, Jeffrey)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marina Graf as to Allstate Insurance Company on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (McBride, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Allstate Insurance Company (kl, )
October 6, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 11/1/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marina Graf by Matthew L. McBride, III (McBride, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McBride, Matthew)
September 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Defendant Allstate Insurance Company on September 3, 2019 by Plaintiff Marina Graf. Waiver of service due by 11/4/2019. (McBride, Matthew)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marina Graf; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16195405.(McBride, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graf v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Graf
Represented By: Matthew L. McBride, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Nowak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?