Social Security Administration v. Logan
Appellant: Social Security Administration
Appellee: Grace Logan
Case Number: 1:2019cv05882
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Appellant Social Security Administration's brief is to be filed by 12/6/2019. Appellee Grace Logan's brief is due by 1/17/2020. Appellant's reply brief, if any, shall be filed by 1/31/2020. The 11/8/2019 status hearing is vacated and reset for 2/28/2020 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 9/24/2019 regarding Notice of Appeal #6 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter)(USBC-Rivera, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 11/8/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Social Security Administration's motion to reassign case based on relatedness #9 is granted. This Court will recommend to the Executive Committee that case 19 C 6567, currently pending before Judge Pacold, be reassigned to this Court as related to this action. Motion hearing held on 10/17/2019. Status hearing set for 11/8/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by David Harold DeCelles for presentment of motion to reassign case #9 before Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (DeCelles, David)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Appellant Social Security Administration to reassign case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Order Modifying Plan))(DeCelles, David)
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin:Status hearing held on 10/2/2019. Status hearing set for 11/8/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 TRANSCRIPT OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS held on 8/20/2019 regarding Notice of Appeal #1 . (To view an image of this document please visit the Bankruptcy Court docket.) (USBC-Rivera, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to bankruptcy appeal #1 Appellant/Appellee Designation of Record (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding 19 A 606 Dkt. 18)(USBC-Rivera, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Grace Logan by Kathryn Marie Liss (Liss, Kathryn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Appellee Grace Logan by Daniel Payne Lindsey (Lindsey, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (srn, )
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 E-MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters to to attorneys of record (Attachments: #1 letter)(las, )
September 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 18 B 31946 (Judge Doyle) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Social Security Administration v. Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: David Harold DeCelles
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Grace Logan
Represented By: Nanshelmun Ruth Dashan
Represented By: Daniel Payne Lindsey
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?