Brown v. Saul
Plaintiff: Brandon D Brown
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv05896
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The order entered 10/24/2019 #13 is vacated. The consent order filed 10/22/2019 #12 having been filed in error is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 12/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. By 11/26/2019, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether they agree to a remand and whether they consent to reassignment for all purposes to the Magistrate Judge. With respect to scheduling, the parties shall comply with Local Rule 16.4.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Correction regarding #12 . (kp, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties have consented to proceed before Magistrate Judge Fuentes #12 . The status hearing set for 12/3/2019 #9 is stricken. This case will be reassigned to Magistrate Judge Fuentes for further proceedings.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 12 FILED on the incorrect docket. (Brown, James) Modified on 10/24/2019 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 10/31/2019 #6 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The Clerk is directed to file the complaint #1 . Initial status hearing set for 12/3/2019 at 9:00 a.m. By 11/26/2019, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether they agree to a remand and whether they consent to reassignment for all purposes to the Magistrate Judge. With respect to scheduling, the parties shall comply with Local Rule 16.4.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT filed by Brandon D Brown. (kp, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION of Alex Harms Hartzler as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Hartzler, Alex)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 PAYMENT of Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16350620. (Brown, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is denied without prejudice for failure to answer Question 2.B. Plaintiff has until 10/18/2019 to either pay the $400 filing fee or file a complete in forma pauperis application. If Plaintiff files an in forma pauperis application and continues to represent that he has no income and no assets, he must explain how he is able to house, clothe, and feed himself. Failure to comply will result in the dismissal of this suit. The status hearing set for 10/2/2019 #4 is stricken and re-set for 10/31/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Brandon D Brown for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Brown, James)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff had neither paid the $400 filing fee nor applied for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has until 9/25/2019 to take either of those steps. Failure to comply will result in the summary dismissal of this case. Status hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 3, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brandon D Brown by James P. Brown (Brown, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brown, James)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Brandon D Brown; (Brown, James) Modified on 9/4/2019 (kp, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: Alex Harms Hartzler
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon D Brown
Represented By: James P. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?