Mearieweather et al v. Tate Computer Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: P. Eboni Mearieweather and MVET Consulting Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Family Christian Health Center and Tate Computer Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05932
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Referring Judge: Gabriel A Fuentes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: This matter having been referred to the magistrate judge for discovery supervision and a settlement conference (doc. #26 ), the Court set an initial status hearing for 11/7/19 at 9:30 a.m., with the parties filing their joint initial status report as earlier contemplated by Judge Coleman on 11/5/19. Mailed notice. (jj, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 26 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER:Case referred to the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes for Discovery Supervision and Settlement Conference. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/29/2019. (jh, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 10/29/2019. Plaintiff's response to defendant Family Christian Health Center's motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) #21 to be filed by 12/13/2019. Defendant's reply to be filed by 1/10/2020. Case is referred to a Magistrate Judge for discovery supervision and settlement. Oral motion by Tate Computer Systems to amend the answer and affirmative defenses is granted. Defendant Tate Computer Systems to file an amended answer and affirmative defenses by 11/12/2019. Plaintiff to file a response 12/3/2019. Status hearing set for 11/8/2019 is stricken and reset to 2/3/2020 at 9:00 AM. Oral motion by defendant Tate Computer Systems for entry of a confidentiality order is granted. Parties are to submit an agreed order to the court's proposed order email. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) along with document production (TCSI 1-490), filed by Defendant Tate Computer Systems, Inc.. (Jacobi, Benjamin)
October 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff P. Eboni Mearieweather. (Vucko, Stacey)
October 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Edward Sarikas for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/29/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Sarikas, Thomas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Family Christian Health Center (Attachments: #1 Declaration Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sarikas, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Family Christian Health Center's unopposed motion to extend the deadline to file a responsive pleading #18 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 10/22/2019. No appearance necessary on 10/16/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas Edward Sarikas for presentment of extension of time #18 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/16/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Sarikas, Thomas)
October 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Family Christian Health Center for extension of time (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sarikas, Thomas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Family Christian Health Center by Thomas Edward Sarikas (Sarikas, Thomas)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs MVET Consulting Solutions, LLC, P. Eboni Mearieweather regarding Complaint, Exhibits (Vucko, Stacey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by P. Eboni Mearieweather, MVET Consulting Solutions, LLC, AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Defendant Family Christian Health Center regarding Complaint, Exhibits and Orders (Vucko, Stacey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Exhibit A - Full Complaint to the Notice of Removal by Tate Computer Systems, Inc.(Jacobi, Benjamin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT by Defendant Tate Computer Systems, Inc. regarding notice of removal, #1 (Jacobi, Benjamin)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Family Christian Health Center by Storrs Whitworth Downey (Downey, Storrs)
September 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Family Christian Health Center. (td, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Tate Computer Systems, Inc.'s unopposed motion to extend the deadline to file responsive pleading and for leave to file an amended exhibit to the notice of removal #7 is granted. Responsive pleadings to be filed by 9/26/2019. No appearance necessary on 9/19/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 14, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs MVET Consulting Solutions, LLC, P. Eboni Mearieweather by Stacey Blaire Vucko (Vucko, Stacey)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 Tate Computer Systems, Inc.'s Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Tate Computer Systems, Inc. (Jacobi, Benjamin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Benjamin Matthew Jacobi for presentment of motion for leave to file,, motion for extension of time to file, #7 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 9/19/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Jacobi, Benjamin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant Tate Computer Systems, Inc. for leave to file Unopposed Motion for Leave to File An Amended Exhibit to the Notice of Removal, MOTION by Defendant Tate Computer Systems, Inc. for extension of time to file Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File a Responsive Pleading (Jacobi, Benjamin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 11/8/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
September 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tate Computer Systems, Inc. by Benjamin Matthew Jacobi (Jacobi, Benjamin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jacobi, Benjamin)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, IL, Law Division, case number (2019L008618) filed by Tate Computer Systems, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16205120. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint)(Jacobi, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mearieweather et al v. Tate Computer Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Christian Health Center
Represented By: Storrs Whitworth Downey
Represented By: Thomas Edward Sarikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate Computer Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Matthew Jacobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. Eboni Mearieweather
Represented By: Stacey Blaire Vucko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MVET Consulting Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Stacey Blaire Vucko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?