Kylie S., v. Pearson, plc
Plaintiff: KYLIE S., individually and as legalguardian for her minor daughter K.S., individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated individuals
Defendant: PEARSON, plc, doing business as Pearson Clinical Assessments and NCS Pearson, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05936
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 10/30/19 is reset to 12/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. A joint status report is due four days before the status hearing.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Anna S., Anthony P., Kylie S, Gena W.. Pearson Education, Inc. waiver sent on 10/17/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Drury, Scott)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Pearson Education, Inc. on 10/17/2019 by Plaintiffs Kylie S, Anthony P., Anna S., Gena W.. Waiver of service due by 11/18/2019. (Drury, Scott)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by Kylie S, Anthony P., Anna S., Gena W. against All Defendants (Drury, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kylie S. Pearson, plc waiver sent on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Drury, Scott)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Kylie S. NCS Pearson, Inc. waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Drury, Scott)
September 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants NCS Pearson, Inc., Pearson, plc. (lw, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Michael Kanovitz Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Kanovitz, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Scott R. Drury Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Drury, Scott)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 10/30/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
September 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KYLIE S., individually and as legalguardian for her minor daughter K.S., individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated individuals by Michael I Kanovitz (Kanovitz, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff KYLIE S., individually and as legalguardian for her minor daughter K.S., individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated individuals by Scott Robert Drury (Drury, Scott)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by KYLIE S., individually and as legalguardian for her minor daughter K.S., individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated individuals; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drury, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kylie S., v. Pearson, plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEARSON, plc, doing business as Pearson Clinical Assessments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCS Pearson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KYLIE S., individually and as legalguardian for her minor daughter K.S., individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated individuals
Represented By: Michael I Kanovitz
Represented By: Scott Robert Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?