U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Northridge Holdings, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Securites And Exchange Commission and U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Glenn C. Mueller, Brookstone Investment Group, Ltd., Unity Investment Group, Ltd., Amberwood Holdings L.P., Southridge Holdings, Ltd., Northridge Holdings, Ltd., Eastridge Holdings, Ltd. and Guardian Investment Group, Ltd.
Claimant: Kathryn Cragg and Alexander Magnus
Receiver: Mr. N. Neville Reid
Case Number: 1:2019cv05957
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2020 Filing 114 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Any objection to the Receiver's motions #110 #112 shall be due by 3/17/20. No appearance is required on these motions. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #112 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/4/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Schultz, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 112 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid Receiver's Motion for Court Approval of (A) Rates to be Charge by Real Estate Broker and (B) Sales Procedures (Timber Lake) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schultz, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 111 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #110 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 3/4/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Schultz, Ryan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 110 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid Receiver's Motion to Authorize Sale of Real Estate and Related Relief (Bartlett Lake Property) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Schultz, Ryan)
February 13, 2020 Filing 109 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 2/12/20. Plaintiff's unopposed motion for entry of judgment, by consent, against Defendant Glenn Mueller #103 is granted. The parties should meet and confer and file a joint proposed scheduled regarding the status of the remainder of the case by 3/4/20. The status hearing set for 2/25/20 is reset to 3/11/20 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER on parties' agreed motion to modify the receivership order and to add receivership Defendants Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/13/20. Mailed notice(ca, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 107 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Glenn C. Mueller by Ryan W. Mitsos (Mitsos, Ryan)
February 7, 2020 Filing 106 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Receiver's Motion #96 for Court Approval of (A) The Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Real Estate Broker (Elston Property); (B) Sales Procedures (Elston Property); (C) The Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Real Estate Broker (Vacant Lots Property) and (D) Sales Procedures (Vacant Lots Property) is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 105 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Alexander Magnus by Eric J. Malnar (Malnar, Eric)
February 4, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE of Motion by Michael D. Foster for presentment of motion to approve consent judgment #103 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/12/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Foster, Michael)
February 4, 2020 Filing 103 MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission to approve consent judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Judgment), #2 Exhibit 2 (Consent))(Foster, Michael)
February 4, 2020 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Agreed motion to modify the receivership order to add receivership Defendants #99 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 101 Receiver's Report for the Period Ending December 31, 2019 by N. Neville Reid (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receiver's Liquidation Plan, #2 Exhibit Timber Lake Apartments P&L - Sep-Dec 2019, #3 Exhibit Bartlett Lake - 561 Deere Park P&L - Sep-Dec 2019, #4 Exhibit 106 Surrey P&L - Sep-Dec 2019, #5 Exhibit 5097 Elston P&L - Sep-Dec 2019, #6 Exhibit Miami Cornerstone P&L - Sep-Dec 2019, #7 Exhibit Vacant Lots Azlan Group P&L - Sep-Dec 2019, #8 Exhibit SFAR & Supporting Schedules - Sep-Dec 2019, #9 Certificate of Service Receiver's Report)(Schultz, Ryan)
January 29, 2020 Filing 100 NOTICE of Motion by Christine Bautista Jeon for presentment of motion to amend/correct #99 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/5/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Jeon, Christine)
January 29, 2020 Filing 99 MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission to amend/correct Receivership Order to Add Receivership Defendants (AGREED MOTION) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jeon, Christine)
January 21, 2020 Filing 98 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Any objection to the Receiver's motion #96 shall be due by 2/4/20. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 17, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #96 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/23/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Schultz, Ryan)
January 17, 2020 Filing 96 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid Receiver's Motion for Court Approval of (A) The Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Real Estate Broker (Elston Property); (B) Sales Procedures (Elston Property); (C) The Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Real Estate Broker (Vacant Lots Property) and (D) Sales Procedures (Vacant Lots Property) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schultz, Ryan)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER authorizing the sale of real estate and granting related relief. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/9/20.Mailed notice(ca, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Receiver's motion to authorize sale of real estate and granting related relief and withdrawal as counsel #88 is granted. Mr. Pandya is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. Mailed notice (ca, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Receiver's First interim fee application and motion for Court approval of payment of fees and expenses of counsel for the receiver #76 is granted. Receiver's motion for Court approval of : (a) The rates to be charged by receiver's real estate broker (Surrey Property) and (b) Sales procedures (Surrey Property) #82 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 92 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Receiver's motion for Court approval of the rates to be charged by receiver's accountant #70 is granted. Receiver's motion for Court approval of sale procedures (Bartlett Property) #72 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 91 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver N. Neville Reid by Louis Brandon Liss (Liss, Louis)
December 20, 2019 Filing 90 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Any objection to the Receivers motion to authorize the sale of the real estate #88 shall be due by 1/6/20. Sujal M Pandya is granted leave to withdraw as counsel. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 89 Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief,, motion to withdraw as attorney, #88 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/8/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Schultz, Ryan)
December 18, 2019 Filing 88 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid Receiver's Motion to (A) Authorize Sale of Real Estate and Granting Relating Relief; and (B) Withdraw as Counsel , MOTION by Attorney Sujal M. Pandya to withdraw as attorney for N. Neville Reid. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Errata B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Schultz, Ryan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 87 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status and motion hearing held on 12/17/19. The receiver's motion for extension of time to file a liquidation plan #80 is granted. Any objections to motions #76 #82 are due in 14 days. Status hearing set for 2/25/20 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 86 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: For the sake of expediency and effective management of the docket, the Court orders that, absent exigent circumstances, the Receiver file a single consolidated motion containing all requests for court approval on a biweekly or (preferably) monthly basis. That motion should be noticed for presentation pursuant to the Local Rules and the Court's standing orders.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status and motion hearing set for 12/12/19 are reset to 12/17/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 84 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of extension of time #80 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schultz, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 83 Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #82 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schultz, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville ReidReceiver's Motion for Court Approval of: (A) Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Real Estate Broker (Surrey Property) and (B) Sales Procedures (Surrey Property) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schultz, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 81 Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of (Schultz, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for extension of time Receiver's Motion for Extension of Time to File Liquidation Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schultz, Ryan)
December 10, 2019 Filing 79 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Receiver's motions 58, 60, 62, and 67 are granted. No objections to these motion were filed.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 10, 2019 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Any objections to the Receiver's motions 70 and 72 should be filed in 14 days. The status hearing set for 12/10/19 is reset to 12/12/19 at 9:00 a.m. No appearance is necessary on the motions.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan Todd Schultz for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #76 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schultz, Ryan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 76 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid First Interim Fee Application and Motion for Court Approval of Payment of Fees and Expenses of Counsel for Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Schultz, Ryan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #72 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
November 25, 2019 Filing 74 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #70 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
November 20, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #72 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/27/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
November 20, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid Motion for Court Approval of Sale Procedures (Bartlett Property) (Pandya, Sujal)
November 20, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #70 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/27/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
November 20, 2019 Filing 70 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for Court Approval of the Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Accountant (Pandya, Sujal)
November 12, 2019 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Any objections to the Receiver's motion for approval #67 should be filed within 14 days of this order. The status hearing set for 11/13/19 is reset to 12/10/19 at 9:15 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #67 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
November 8, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for Court Approval of the Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Forensic Accountant (Pandya, Sujal)
November 6, 2019 Filing 66 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Any objections to the Receiver's motions #58 , #60 , and #62 should be filed in 14 days. No appearance is necessary on the motions. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 65 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to compel #53 is withdrawn, pursuant to the notice of withdrawal. The status hearing set for 10/31/19 is reset to 11/13/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 64 Notice of Withdrawal by N. Neville Reid of Receiver's Motion to Enforce Receivership Order and for Entry of an Order Compelling JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Account for and Turnover Receivership Assets to Receiver [Dkt. 53] (Pandya, Sujal)
October 30, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #62 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
October 30, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for Court Approval of: (A) the Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Real Estate Broker (Bartlett Property) and (B) Receiver's Retention of Brokers for Certain Other Real Estate (Pandya, Sujal)
October 30, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #60 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
October 30, 2019 Filing 60 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for Court Approval of the Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Property Tax Appeal Counsel (Pandya, Sujal)
October 30, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #58 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/7/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
October 30, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for Court Approval of the Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Accountant (Pandya, Sujal)
October 29, 2019 Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimant Kathryn Cragg by Shannon Virginia Condon (Condon, Shannon)
October 25, 2019 Filing 56 STATUS Report (Joint) by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission (Foster, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Filing 55 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 10/23/19. At the request of counsel, the motion for turnover #53 is entered and continued for 10/31/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion to compel #53 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
October 16, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid to compel JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Account for and Turnover Receivership Assets to Receiver (Pandya, Sujal)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER approving the rates to be charged by receiver's property manager Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/11/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Receiver's motion for Court approval of the rates to be charged by receiver's property manager #41 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE re MIDPP Obligations by Timothy Stockwell (Jeon, Christine)
October 4, 2019 Filing 48 CERTIFICATE re MIDPP Obligations by Christine Jeon (Jeon, Christine)
October 3, 2019 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE re MIDPP Obligations (Foster, Michael)
October 2, 2019 Filing 50 LETTER from Harry A. Carr IV, Paralegal-TD Ameritrade, Inc. dated 9/30/2019. (Exhibits) (jh, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER from Steve Postier dated 9/23/2019. (Received for docketing on 10/2/2019) (nsf, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE of Service by Sujal M Pandya on behalf of N. Neville Reid regarding order #22 (Pandya, Sujal)
September 24, 2019 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The Receiver has filed a motion for court approval of rates of property manager. #41 Any objections should be filed by 10/2/19. No appearance is necessary on the motion. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The Receiver's motion for court approval of the rates to be charged by counsel #29 is granted. No objections to the motion were filed.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #41 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/25/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
September 20, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for Court Approval of the Rates to be Charged by Receiver's Property Manager (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(Pandya, Sujal)
September 19, 2019 Filing 40 Certified STATEMENT by Barings Multifamily Capital LLC (Adkins, Tammy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY Appearance for Unknown Barings Multifamily Capital LLC by Tammy L. Adkins (Adkins, Tammy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 38 ATTORNEY Appearance for Creditor Federal National Mortgage Association by Andrew Thomas McClain (McClain, Andrew)
September 19, 2019 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Creditor Federal National Mortgage Association by Jill L. Nicholson (Nicholson, Jill)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/19/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION regarding order #23 (Foster, Michael)
September 17, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Service and Waiver of Service of Receivership Order by Sujal M Pandya on behalf of N. Neville Reid regarding order #22 (Pandya, Sujal)
September 16, 2019 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Any objections to the Receiver's motion for court approval of the rates charged by counsel #29 should be filed by 9/23/19. No appearance is necessary on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver N. Neville Reid by Norman Neville Reid (Reid, Norman)
September 13, 2019 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Guardian Investment Group, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Sujal M Pandya for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #29 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/17/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Pandya, Sujal)
September 12, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION by Receiver N. Neville Reid for Court Approval of the Rates to Be Charged by Receivers Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rate Schedule, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Pandya, Sujal)
September 12, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver N. Neville Reid by Sujal M Pandya (Pandya, Sujal)
September 12, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Receiver N. Neville Reid by Ryan Todd Schultz (Schultz, Ryan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Glenn C. Mueller waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Amberwood Holdings L.P. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Unity Investment Group, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of preliminary injunction and other emergency relief upon consent Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/12/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER appointing receiver Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/12/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Brookstone Investment Group, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Eastridge Holdings, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion hearing held on 9/12/19. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order #3 is granted pursuant to the terms of the agreed orders. Enter orders. If the parties are unable to resolve their disagreement as to the $145,000 deposit, they are to submit their respective positions in a memorandum not to exceed 5 pages by 9/18/19. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Southridge Holdings, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 12, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission. Northridge Holdings, Ltd. waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Jeon, Christine)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 10/31/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Motion hearing held on 9/9/19. For the reason stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order to prevent violations of the Federal Securities Laws, to appoint a receiver, and provide for other ancillary relief #3 is entered and continued to 9/12/19 at 3:30 p.m. to provide additional time for the parties to dismiss the terms of the proposed orders. Until that time, Defendants through counsel have agreed to be bound by the terms of the proposed temporary restraining order submitted by the SEC..Mailed notice (ca, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission by Timothy Jon Stockwell (Stockwell, Timothy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Timothy Stockwell #11 is granted. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Government Attorney (Stockwell, Timothy)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Christine Bautista Jeon for presentment of motion for temporary restraining order #3 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM. (Jeon, Christine)
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amberwood Holdings L.P., Brookstone Investment Group, Ltd., Eastridge Holdings, Ltd., Glenn C. Mueller, Northridge Holdings, Ltd., Southridge Holdings, Ltd., Unity Investment Group, Ltd. by Barry A. Spevack (Spevack, Barry)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amberwood Holdings L.P., Brookstone Investment Group, Ltd., Eastridge Holdings, Ltd., Glenn C. Mueller, Northridge Holdings, Ltd., Southridge Holdings, Ltd., Unity Investment Group, Ltd. by Michael D. Monico (Monico, Michael)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Amberwood Holdings L.P., Brookstone Investment Group, Ltd., Eastridge Holdings, Ltd., Glenn C. Mueller, Northridge Holdings, Ltd., Southridge Holdings, Ltd., Unity Investment Group, Ltd. by Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson (Jacobson, Jacqueline)
September 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Securites And Exchange Commission by Christine Bautista Jeon (Jeon, Christine)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Foster, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM by Securites And Exchange Commission in support of motion for temporary restraining order #3 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Saylor Declaration), #2 Exhibit B (Wilder Declaration), #3 Exhibit C (Petroff Declaration), #4 Exhibit D (Stefan Declaration), #5 Exhibit E (McGarry Declaration), #6 Exhibit F (Smith Declaration), #7 Exhibit G (Mueller Declaration), #8 Exhibit H (Case Copies), #9 Exhibit I (Case Copies))(Foster, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Plaintiff Securites And Exchange Commission for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Receivership Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed TRO)(Foster, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Securites And Exchange Commission by Michael D. Foster (Foster, Michael)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Securites And Exchange Commission; Jury Demand. (Foster, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission v. Northridge Holdings, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn C. Mueller
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Represented By: Ryan W. Mitsos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookstone Investment Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unity Investment Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amberwood Holdings L.P.
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southridge Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northridge Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eastridge Holdings, Ltd.
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Investment Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Jacqueline Sharon Jacobson
Represented By: Michael D. Monico
Represented By: Barry A. Spevack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securites And Exchange Commission
Represented By: Christine Bautista Jeon
Represented By: Michael D. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Christine Bautista Jeon
Represented By: Michael D. Foster
Represented By: Timothy Jon Stockwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Kathryn Cragg
Represented By: Shannon Virginia Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Alexander Magnus
Represented By: Eric J. Malnar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Mr. N. Neville Reid
Represented By: Norman Neville Reid
Represented By: Ryan Todd Schultz
Represented By: Sujal M Pandya
Represented By: Louis Brandon Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?