Hodede v. Boeing Company, The
Plaintiff: Noa Matsliah Hodede
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Case Number: 1:2019cv05971
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Referring Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court orders all individual related actions, 19 C 5756, 19 C 5971, 19 C 6022, 19 C 6023,19 C 6025, 19 C 6077, 19 C 6079, 19 C 6099, 19 C 6102, 19 C 6149, 19 C 6153, 19 C 6176, 19 C 6177, 19 C 6180, 19 C 6181, to be consolidated under case number 19 C 2170. This order will be implemented by the Clerk of Court submitting JS-6 forms to the Administrative Office for the individual related actions. This will designate the individual related actions as closed for administrative and statistical purposes. This order will not be considered a dismissal or disposition of these actions on the merits. All future pleadings are to be filed in the consolidated case alone (19 C 2170). No pleadings should be filed in any of the individual related actions which are to be administratively closed. Any additional related cases filed in the future and assigned to Judge Alonso will also be administratively closed and consolidated with this case. Should any party believe at any point in the future that separate proceedings have become necessary for that party's particular claims, the party should make a motion in the consolidated case 19 C 2170 seeking relief. The Clerk is also directed to transfer all attorney appearances in the individual related actions to 19 C 2170. Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 10/16/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, )
October 16, 2019 CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. See docket 19cv2170 for all further entries. (bg, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Jorge L. Alonso is presiding over 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash and the Hon. M. David Weisman as the designated magistrate judge; and It further appearing that the cases listed below are related to 19 CV 2170, In re: Ethiopian Airlines Fight ET 302 Crash pursuant to Local Rule 40.4; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Alonso shall be reassigned the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Weisman shall be the designated magistrate judge in these cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/3/2019. (bg, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing is set for 11/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Noa Matsliah Hodede by Sarah Elizabeth Buck (Buck, Sarah)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Noa Matsliah Hodede by Andrew T. Hays (Hays, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hays, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Noa Matsliah Hodede; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16209696. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Appointing Special Administrator, #2 Appendix I, #3 Appendix II, #4 Appendix III)(Hays, Andrew)
September 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Boeing Company, The (mc, )
September 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hodede v. Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noa Matsliah Hodede
Represented By: Andrew T. Hays
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?