Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC v. BTW Auto, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC
Defendant: Thomas A. Walaszek and BTW Auto, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05980
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Parties' joint motion for an extension of the deadline to exchange initial discovery #16 is granted. Parties shall exchange MIDP discovery by 12/4/19. No appearance necessary on 11/7/19. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Maisa Jean Frank for presentment of extension of time #16 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 11/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Frank, Maisa)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC for extension of time to Exchange Initial Discovery (Joint) (Frank, Maisa)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing set for 11/6/19 is stricken and re-set to 12/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by BTW Auto, Inc., Thomas A. Walaszek(Ehlers, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for BTW Auto, Inc., Thomas A. Walaszek (Ehlers, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/3/2019 (bg, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC as to Thomas A. Walaszek on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. served on Thomas A. Walaszek on September 12, 2019 (Papadopoulos, Athanasios) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 9/30/2019 (bg, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC as to BTW Auto, Inc. on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. served on BTW Auto, Inc., c/o Thomas Walaszek on September 12, 2019 (Papadopoulos, Athanasios) (Docket text modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 9/30/2019 (bg, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Appearance by BTW Auto, Inc. and Thomas Walaszek (Tibble, Douglas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing is set for 11/6/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Stephan J. Vaughn and Maisa Jean Frank's motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 and #7 are granted. Counsel is reminded to become familiar with this court's local rules (including the rules requiring local counsel and describing this court's trial bar). Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16216818. (Frank, Maisa)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16216775. (Vaughan, Stephen)
September 9, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Thomas A. Walaszek (mc, )
September 9, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant BTW Auto, Inc. (mc, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
September 6, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC by Bryan E Minier (Minier, Bryan)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC re complaint #1 (Papadopoulos, Athanasios)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC by Athanasios Papadopoulos (Papadopoulos, Athanasios)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16212313. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Papadopoulos, Athanasios)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC v. BTW Auto, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merlin Franchisor SPV, LLC
Represented By: Bryan E Minier
Represented By: Athanasios Papadopoulos
Represented By: Stephen J. Vaughan
Represented By: Maisa Jean Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Walaszek
Represented By: Elizabeth Rebecca Bacon Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTW Auto, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Rebecca Bacon Ehlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?