Sypolt et al v. The Illinois Gaming Board et al
Plaintiff: Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt and Phase IV-D, Inc.
Defendant: Mark Ostrowski, Anthony Garcia, Thomas Hobgood, Charles Schamdeke, Marcus Fruchter, The Illinois Gaming Board, Dionne R. Hayden, Fidel Aguilar, Donald Tracy, Thomas Dunn, Dee Robinson, Ruben, Jr. Ramirez, Hector Alejandre and Steven C Dolins
Case Number: 1:2019cv05991
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Fidel Aguilar, Hector Alejandre, Steven C Dolins, Thomas Dunn, Marcus Fruchter, Anthony Garcia, Dionne R. Hayden, Thomas Hobgood, Mark Ostrowski, Ruben, Jr. Ramirez, Dee Robinson, Charles Schamdeke, The Illinois Gaming Board, Donald Tracy by Michael D. Arnold (Arnold, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Michael D. Arnold for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 11/14/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Arnold, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Fidel Aguilar, Hector Alejandre, Steven C Dolins, Thomas Dunn, Marcus Fruchter, Anthony Garcia, Dionne R. Hayden, Thomas Hobgood, Mark Ostrowski, Ruben, Jr. Ramirez, Dee Robinson, Charles Schamdeke, The Illinois Gaming Board, Donald Tracy in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #21 (Arnold, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Fidel Aguilar, Hector Alejandre, Steven C Dolins, Thomas Dunn, Marcus Fruchter, Anthony Garcia, Dionne R. Hayden, Thomas Hobgood, Mark Ostrowski, Ruben, Jr. Ramirez, Dee Robinson, Charles Schamdeke, The Illinois Gaming Board, Donald Tracy (Arnold, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Phase IV-D, Inc., Kevin Sypolt, Trudy's Cafe, LLC by Jeffrey Bruce Steinback (Steinback, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Donald Tracy waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Charles Schamdeke waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Dee Robinson waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Ruben, Jr. Ramirez waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Mark Ostrowski waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. The Illinois Gaming Board waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC. Dionne R. Hayden waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Anthony Garcia waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Marcus Fruchter waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Thomas Dunn waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Steven C Dolins waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. Hector Alejandre waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Dicianni, Matthew)(Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) Modified on 10/10/2019 (aee, ).
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.. (Dicianni, Matthew)
October 2, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 11/14/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Honorable Ruben Castillo has elected to retire effective September 27, 2019; and It further appearing that cases previously assigned to the Honorable Ruben Castillo requires reassignment; therefore It is hereby ordered that the cases on the attached list are to be reassigned to the other judges of this Court pursuant to Local Rule 40.1(f). Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Honorable Ruben Castillo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/30/2019.(sm, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
September 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Phase IV-D, Inc., Kevin Sypolt, Trudy's Cafe, LLC by Matthew T. Dicianni (Dicianni, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dicianni, Matthew)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trudy's Cafe, LLC, Kevin Sypolt, Phase IV-D, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16213322. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dicianni, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sypolt et al v. The Illinois Gaming Board et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ostrowski
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Garcia
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Hobgood
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schamdeke
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus Fruchter
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Illinois Gaming Board
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dionne R. Hayden
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel Aguilar
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Tracy
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dee Robinson
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben, Jr. Ramirez
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Alejandre
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven C Dolins
Represented By: Michael D. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trudy's Cafe, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Dicianni
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Steinback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Sypolt
Represented By: Matthew T. Dicianni
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Steinback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phase IV-D, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T. Dicianni
Represented By: Jeffrey Bruce Steinback
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?