Gordon v. Saul
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Gordon
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv06017
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Referring Judge: Sidney I Schenkier
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Virginia M. Kendall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 9/26/2019. (rp, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Treacy, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Treacy, Elizabeth)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing and remanding the decision subject to review is due 60 days after administrative record is filed. The Commissioner's motion to affirm the decision and brief in support thereof are due 45 days after Plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after the Commissioner's brief is filed. Parties are encouraged to consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge in order receive expeditious ruling on the matter due to the significant caseload of the District Court. Parties are to meet and confer by 10/3/2019 to discuss whether they jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge and file consent form. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate Judge Form) (lk, )
September 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Joseph Gordon by Justin Roger Poh (Poh, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Joseph Gordon by Joseph Stephen Sellers (Sellers, Joseph)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michael Joseph Gordon by Deborah Susan Spector (Spector, Deborah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spector, Deborah)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Michael Joseph Gordon; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16215468.(Spector, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gordon v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Joseph Gordon
Represented By: Joseph Stephen Sellers
Represented By: Justin Roger Poh
Represented By: Deborah Susan Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?