Top Tobacco, L.P. et al v. The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Republic Tobacco, L.P., Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Top Tobacco, L.P. and wangyanhong362
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A", Awonderfulschool, E . K . J Store, 2018bestbuy123, coraswinter, jjfbay, hlongya_0, Good Lifestyle Store, ydx0707, smokesister, doraemon-auto, Enjoy Life House Store, wrb6843296, yujun623, earlysuntechnology6, ehappy company, beeb.shop, Ally Fun Store, shisha_time, Desire Smoking Store, Bearhug Store, margie-jackson, rindhard, bdys_31, Lilian's Manor Store, Blue sky Green sea, rom corp 1984 store, Loretta Store, musknut, Boomshakalakaa, vindlla, jack-8788, fabulouswayx, Youry Life Store, Sports station, aserious, Friendly Life Store, Showing For Yourself, kevin2008, Pawprint Store, Good Groceries Store, Super team company, shop325417 store, magic_house2018, bbj, La Favorita Flagship Store, jetsun5022, Navapex Store, syong54, to-drill, ahai006, Wonder Storage Store, themestown, MajicToys Store, Smarter Life Store, dasdf, heloie, Homartisan Direct Store, gems.toys, yalerwu, CHUWUJU Storage Store, mr._smoking_bruce and hudan123
Case Number: 1:2019cv06032
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 35 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/22/2019. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status and motion hearing held on 10/22/2019. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #31 is granted. Enter Order. Status hearing set for 12/3/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #31 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/22/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #31 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
October 16, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Top Tobacco, L.P., Republic Tobacco, L.P., Republic Technologies (NA), LLC as to The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A" on 10/16/2019, answer due 11/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Abby M. Neu)(Neu, Abby)
October 16, 2019 Filing 29 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Abby Marie Neu (Neu, Abby)
October 7, 2019 Filing 28 EXTENSION OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/7/2019. Motion to extend temporary restraining order #25 is granted, good cause having been shown. The status and motion hearing date of 19/8/2019 is vacated. Status hearing and hearing on motion for preliminary injunction is reset to 10/22/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
October 7, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00 posted by Greer Burns & Crain, Ltd. for Plaintiff, Top Tobacco, L.P.; Receipt No. 4624231308. (acm, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #25 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. in support of extension of time #25 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
September 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ALLY FUN STORE and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (acm, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 24 SEALED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/24/2019. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 9/24/2019. Motion for leave to file under seal #6 , motion for temporary restraining order #11 , and motion for electronic service of process #15 are granted. Sealed temporary restraining order to expire on 10/8/2019 to follow. Status hearing and preliminary injunction hearing set for 10/8/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (pjg, )
September 15, 2019 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, because it will be unable to hold a 9:30 AM court call on 9/18/2019, the motion hearing set for that date is reset to 9/24/2019 at 9:30 AM. (mk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. regarding declaration #14 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2-1, #2 Exhibit 2-2, #3 Exhibit 2-3, #4 Exhibit 2-4, #5 Exhibit 2-5)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 19 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 , motion for temporary restraining order #11 , motion for miscellaneous relief #15 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #16 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #15 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Sachin Lele regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #11 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. for temporary restraining order Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jh, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
September 9, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Republic Tobacco, L.P., Top Tobacco, L.P. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Top Tobacco, L.P., Republic Tobacco, L.P., Republic Technologies (NA), LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16216926. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Top Tobacco, L.P. et al v. The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Tobacco, L.P.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Top Tobacco, L.P.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Abby Marie Neu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: wangyanhong362
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unicorporated Associations Identified On Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Awonderfulschool
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E . K . J Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2018bestbuy123
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: coraswinter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jjfbay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hlongya_0
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Lifestyle Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ydx0707
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: smokesister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: doraemon-auto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enjoy Life House Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wrb6843296
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yujun623
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: earlysuntechnology6
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ehappy company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: beeb.shop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Fun Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shisha_time
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desire Smoking Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bearhug Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: margie-jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rindhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bdys_31
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilian's Manor Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue sky Green sea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: rom corp 1984 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: musknut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boomshakalakaa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: vindlla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jack-8788
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: fabulouswayx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youry Life Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports station
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aserious
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friendly Life Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Showing For Yourself
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kevin2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pawprint Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Groceries Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super team company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: shop325417 store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: magic_house2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: bbj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Favorita Flagship Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: jetsun5022
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navapex Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: syong54
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: to-drill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ahai006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wonder Storage Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: themestown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MajicToys Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smarter Life Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: dasdf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: heloie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homartisan Direct Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: gems.toys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: yalerwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUWUJU Storage Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: mr._smoking_bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: hudan123
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?