Sharif v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Richard Sharif
Defendant: Bruce De'Medici, Luma Hambaroush-Sharif, Horace Fox, Jr., Arthur Newman and Bradley Block
Case Number: 1:2019cv06035
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel B. Meyer for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #36 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/14/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Meyer, Daniel)
November 5, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION by Defendant Horace Fox, Jr To Adopt (Meyer, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 35 STATUS Report by Horace Fox, Jr (Meyer, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Michael J. Corsi for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #33 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/14/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Corsi, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Defendant Bradley BlockTo Refer Case to Bankruptcy Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Corsi, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel B. Meyer for presentment of motion for extension of time to file #31 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/14/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Meyer, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION by Defendant Horace Fox, Jr for extension of time to file responsive pleading (Meyer, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Motion by Brendan John Nelligan for presentment of motion to dismiss #28 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/14/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Nelligan, Brendan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM by Arthur Newman in support of motion to dismiss #28 (Nelligan, Brendan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant Arthur Newman to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Nelligan, Brendan)
October 29, 2019 Filing 27 INITIAL STATUS Report by Richard Sharif. (smm, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motions for extension of time #20 , #22 and #24 are granted. Any responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 11/1/2019. Motion hearings set for 10/10/2019 are stricken. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP Standing Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Courts official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 11/14/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 11/4/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Daniel B. Meyer for presentment of extension of time #24 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Meyer, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendant Horace Fox, Jr for extension of time (Meyer, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Thomas James Long for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #22 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Long, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants Bradley Block, Bruce De'MediciAdopt Motion to Enlarge Time (Long, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew James Egan for presentment of extension of time #20 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 10/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Egan, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendant Arthur Newman for extension of time (Egan, Matthew)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bradley Block, Bruce De'Medici by Thomas James Long (Long, Thomas)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bradley Block, Bruce De'Medici by Michael J. Corsi (Corsi, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bradley Block, Bruce De'Medici by Amir R. Tahmassebi (Tahmassebi, Amir)
October 1, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bradley Block, Bruce De'Medici by Michael Patrick Hannigan (Hannigan, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Bradley Block, Bruce De'Medici by Daniel Francis Konicek (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Konicek, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Horace Fox, Jr re attorney appearance #13 (Flagel, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Horace Fox, Jr by Mark Flagel (Flagel, Mark)
October 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Horace Fox, Jr re attorney appearance #11 (Meyer, Daniel)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Horace Fox, Jr by Daniel B. Meyer (Meyer, Daniel)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arthur Newman by Kayla Ann Condeni (Condeni, Kayla)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arthur Newman by Brendan John Nelligan (Nelligan, Brendan)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Arthur Newman by Matthew James Egan (Egan, Matthew)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Robert Blakey for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/12/2019. (sxb, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Bradley Block, Bruce De'Medici, Horace Fox, Jr, Luma Hambaroush-Sharif, Arthur Newman. (jh, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Richard Sharif. (jh, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Richard Sharif. (Exhibits) (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharif v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce De'Medici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luma Hambaroush-Sharif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horace Fox, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sharif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?