Lekah v. Saul
Plaintiff: Steven Lekah
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv06047
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Susan E Cox
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cox. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 11/8/2019. Also by 11/8/2019, Defendant shall file a certified copy of the administrative record and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Plaintiff's opening brief is due on or before 1/7/20. Defendant's response brief is due on or before 2/21/20. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 3/6/20. Mailed notice (np, )
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Susan E. Cox pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 8/15/2019. (nsf, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the joint consent, the status hearing of 10/21/2019 with Judge Chang is vacated. The consent will be processed with the Executive Committee. Emailed notice (slb, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Hancock, Virginia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Hancock, Virginia)
October 15, 2019 Filing 5 STATUS Report by Steven Lekah (Marcus, Meredith)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 10/21/2019 at 9 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
September 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Lekah by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Steven Lekah by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Steven Lekah; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16219038. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lekah v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lekah
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Virginia Ovitz Hancock
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?