Hirmiz v. Madsen et al
Plaintiff: Suha B Hirmiz
Defendant: Director Kenneth Madsen, Director USCIS L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kenneth Madsen and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv06065
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey T Gilbert
Referring Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Per the parties' Stipulation of Dismissal Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 #13 , this case is dismissed without prejudice under Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The status hearing set for 1/21/20 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken with no appearance required. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ber, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Jointly filed) (Weintraub, J.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: Status hearing held on 11/6/19. Counsel for the Defendants appeared and reported on the status of the case. Plaintiff was unable to appear because he was appearing with his client for an interview with USCIS. By 1/13/20, Defendants either will answer or otherwise plead to the complaint, or, in the alternative, the parties will file a joint status report that explains the status of the case at that time. In that report, the parties should address whether it is necessary for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead. If the parties are not in agreement, the report should contain an explanation of the positions of both sides. Although not discussed on the record, for docket control purposes, if the case is not resolved by 1/13/20, then the case is set for a status hearing on 1/21/20 at 10:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ber, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gilbert. Initial status hearing scheduled for 11/6/19 at 11:00 a.m. An initial status report is not required. Prior to the status hearing, however, the parties shall familiarize themselves with the subjects referenced in Magistrate Judge Gilbert's Standing Order for Initial Status Report and his Standing Order for Settlement Conference posted on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges as applicable to consent cases. Mailed notice (ber, )
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Mary M. Rowland no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 10/25/2019. (lma, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The parties consent to proceed before the magistrate judge, as stated in the Joint Status Report #9 . The initial status hearing set for 11/7/19 is stricken. Reassignment order to follow shortly. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 STATUS Report (JOINT) by L. Francis Cissna, Kenneth Madsen, Kevin K. McAleenan (Weintraub, J.)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Kenneth Madsen, Kevin K. McAleenan by J. Max Weintraub (Weintraub, J.)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Kenneth Madsen, Kevin K. McAleenan (Oswald, Craig)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants L. Francis Cissna, Kenneth Madsen, Kevin K. McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing is set for 11/7/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
September 10, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to L. Francis Cissna, Kenneth Madsen, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Attorney. (lw, )
September 10, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Suha B Hirmiz by Ivan Tomic (Tomic, Ivan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tomic, Ivan)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Suha B Hirmiz; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16222595.(Tomic, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hirmiz v. Madsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suha B Hirmiz
Represented By: Ivan Tomic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kenneth Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director USCIS L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Madsen
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: J. Max Weintraub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?