Walker v. Gatsios et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Walker
Defendant: Timmie S Deberry, Hipolito Velazquez, A Rodriguez, Town of Chicago, Kevin Fredrick, V N Gatsios, Timothy M. Hawkins, K J Bunge, Eraclio Ruiz, Malik Jeffrey, Chicago Police Department and P M Brannigan
Case Number: 1:2019cv06072
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 E-MAILED copy of order #7 to Fiscal Department and Trust Fund Officer at Cook County Jail (las, )
October 2, 2019 MAILED copy of order #7 and blank amended complaint form to plaintiff (las, )
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER : Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $12.67 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send (electronically if possible) a copy of this order to the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's current place of incarceration and to the Court's Fiscal Department. However, summons shall not issue. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a federal claim. Failure to submit a proposed amended complaint by November 5, 2019 will result in summary dismissal of this matter. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff a blank amended complaint form and a copy of this order. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 10/1/2019. Mailed notice(las, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Prisoner Local Rule 83.15 Letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 RECEIVED from Illinois Central; Case Number 1:19-cv-01298 (kp)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 9/9/2019. Plaintiff has initiated this lawsuit in the Central District of Illinois, but his allegations are against Chicago Police Department Officers regarding an arrest in Chicago, Illinois. Venue for federal civil rights actions brought under 42 U.S.C. Sec 1983 is governed by 28 U.S.C. Sec 1391(b). According to that statute, such actions may be brought only in (1) the judicial district where any defendant resides (if all defendants reside in the same State), (2) a judicial district in which a substantial part of the events or omissions giving rise to the claim occurred, or (3) a judicial district in which any defendant may be found, if there is no district in which the action may otherwise be brought. The events giving rise to the claims in this lawsuit occurred in Chicago, Illinois, which is situated in the federal judicial district for the Northern District of Illinois, and all the Defendants are located in Chicago. 28 U.S.C. Sec 93. The court therefore finds that venue over this proceeding is in the Northern District of Illinois, and that it is in the interests of justice that this cause be transferred there. See 28 U.S.C. Sec 1404(a). No summons shall issue in this action unless directed by the transferee court. The clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Northern District of Illinois. (KE, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 9/10/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Joshua Walker. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (KE, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 9/10/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER by Joshua Walker. (KE, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 9/10/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua Walker. Responses due by 9/23/2019 (KE, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 9/10/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joshua Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(KE, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 9/10/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Gatsios et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timmie S Deberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hipolito Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Fredrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V N Gatsios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy M. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K J Bunge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eraclio Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malik Jeffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P M Brannigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?