Soufi v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Kinan Soufi
Defendant: David Bowdich, Kevin McAleenan and Mick Dedvukaj
Case Number: 1:2019cv06076
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Plaintiff having filed a notice of voluntary dismissal #6 , the instant action is hereby dismissed without prejudice. All pending dates and motions, if any, are stricken as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (mw, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Odeh, Reem)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Oswald, Craig)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan (Treacy, Elizabeth)
September 17, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (lw, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 11/6/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
September 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kinan Soufi by Reem H Odeh (Odeh, Reem)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kinan Soufi; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16224513. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Odeh, Reem)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soufi v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bowdich
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Dedvukaj
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinan Soufi
Represented By: Reem H Odeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?