Pechulis et al v. Pipeline Health Systems LLC
Plaintiff: Shellye Pechulis, Anna Marie Falcone and Jodie Holich
Defendant: Pipeline Health Systems LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06089
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant's NOTICE of Motion by Richard Patrick Darke for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #18 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 11/13/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Darke, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Pipeline Health Systems LLC Memorandum in Support (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Darke, Richard)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Pipeline Health Systems LLC (Darke, Richard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS Report Plaintiffs' Initial Status Report by Anna Marie Falcone, Jodie Holich, Shellye Pechulis (Scharg, Ari)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court amends minute entry #14 . Defendants to respond by 11/8/2019 to plaintiffs' complaint. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: The Court grants defendant's motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint #12 . Although the motion does not state the position of plaintiffs, the Court finds that this brief first extension will not prejudice the plaintiffs. Defendant to respond by 10/9/2019. No appearance is necessary on 10/9/2019. Mailed notice. (ym, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Richard Patrick Darke for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #12 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 10/9/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Darke, Richard)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Pipeline Health Systems LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Darke, Richard)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Pipeline Health Systems LLC by Richard Patrick Darke (Darke, Richard)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shellye Pechulis (Scharg, Ari)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shellye Pechulis as to Pipeline Health Systems LLC on 9/18/2019, answer due 10/9/2019. (Scharg, Ari)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 11/12/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
September 11, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Pipeline Health Systems LLC (mc, )
September 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anna Marie Falcone, Jodie Holich, Shellye Pechulis by J. Eli Wade Scott (Wade Scott, J.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anna Marie Falcone, Jodie Holich, Shellye Pechulis by Michael W Ovca (Ovca, Michael)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anna Marie Falcone, Jodie Holich, Shellye Pechulis by Jay Edelson (Edelson, Jay)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Anna Marie Falcone, Jodie Holich, Shellye Pechulis by Ari Jonathan Scharg (Scharg, Ari)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Scharg, Ari)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Shellye Pechulis, Jodie Holich, Anna Marie Falcone; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16225777.(Scharg, Ari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pechulis et al v. Pipeline Health Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shellye Pechulis
Represented By: Michael W Ovca
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: J. Eli Wade Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Marie Falcone
Represented By: Michael W Ovca
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: J. Eli Wade Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Holich
Represented By: Michael W Ovca
Represented By: Jay Edelson
Represented By: Ari Jonathan Scharg
Represented By: J. Eli Wade Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeline Health Systems LLC
Represented By: Richard Patrick Darke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?