PNC Bank, National Association v. PTCOI Real Estate, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: PTCOI Real Estate, LLC, Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC, Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC, Donald E. Roland and Faris Abusharif
Case Number: 1:2019cv06098
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Status hearing held and continued to 12/3/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Defendant Roland shall answer the complaint by 11/19/2019. Mailed notice (ags, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to Faris Abusharif on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Donald E. Roland by Leon E. Farbman (Farbman, Leon)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Donald E. Roland by Jeffrey Edward Schiller (Schiller, Jeffrey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 11/5/2019 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to Donald E. Roland on 9/22/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to PTCOI Real Estate, LLC on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
September 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Faris Abusharif, PTCOI Real Estate, LLC, Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC, Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC, Donald E. Roland (yt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association by Justin Kyle Malenius (Malenius, Justin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association by Kurt M. Carlson (Carlson, Kurt)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association by Martin J. Wasserman (Wasserman, Martin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wasserman, Martin)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by PNC Bank, National Association; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16227041. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E)(Wasserman, Martin)
September 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. PTCOI Real Estate, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTCOI Real Estate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. Roland
Represented By: Leon E. Farbman
Represented By: Jeffrey Edward Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faris Abusharif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Justin Kyle Malenius
Represented By: Martin J. Wasserman
Represented By: Kurt M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?