Rodonis v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leanne Rodonis
Defendant: Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06108
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendant Walmart, Inc. Discovery Request to Plaintiff (Sun, Lucas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held. Fact discovery is ordered closed by 2/11/2020. Status hearing is set for 2/11/2020 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 10/24/2019 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by Lucas Sun (Sun, Lucas)
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by Ariel Terese Flood (Flood, Ariel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Walmart Inc. by James P. Balog (Balog, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Balog, James)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County Law Division, case number (2019L008300) filed by Walmart Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16228480. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Balog, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodonis v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanne Rodonis
Represented By: Thomas J. Stiberth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Ariel Terese Flood
Represented By: James P. Balog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Ariel Terese Flood
Represented By: James P. Balog
Represented By: Lucas Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?