Cyranoski v. Altus Receivables Management, INC.
Plaintiff: David Cyranoski
Defendant: Altus Receivables Management, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06111
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 11/5/19. The parties are to exchange MIDP disclosures by 11/26/19; initial written discovery requests are to be served by 12/20/19; the deadline to amend the pleadings and join parties is 4/10/20. Fact discovery shall close on 6/30/20. Status hearing set for 2/13/20 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff David Cyranoski. (Miller, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Altus Receivables Management, INC. by Adam John Florek (Florek, Adam)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by David Cyranoski (Miller, Daniel)
October 4, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Affiliates STATEMENT by Altus Receivables Management, INC. (Dorsey, William)
October 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Altus Receivables Management, INC.(Dorsey, William)
September 30, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Altus Receivables Management, INC. by William Jay Dorsey (Dorsey, William)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE Certification By Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Miller, Daniel)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE Certification By Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Combs, Cathleen)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE Certification By Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Edelman, Daniel)
September 17, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Cyranoski as to Altus Receivables Management, INC. on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Miller, Daniel)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 11/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
September 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Altus Receivables Management, INC. (daj, )
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Cyranoski by Daniel S Miller (Miller, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Cyranoski by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Cyranoski by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Cyranoski; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16229028. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to Complaint)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cyranoski v. Altus Receivables Management, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altus Receivables Management, INC.
Represented By: William Jay Dorsey
Represented By: Adam John Florek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Cyranoski
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Daniel S Miller
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?