PNC Bank, National Association v. Abusharif et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Faris Abusharif, Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC, MMN Sharif, Inc. and Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06116
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association regarding order #19 (Wasserman, Martin)
November 6, 2019 Filing 19 DEFAULT Judgment Order Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/6/19. Mailed notice(ca, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status and motion hearing held on 11/5/19. Motion for entry of default judgment as to Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC and Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC, and MMN Sharif, Inc. is granted. Plaintiff should submit a proposed order and contact the courtroom deputy when they have done so. A motion for default judgment as to Faris Abusharif is due by 11/14/19 and should be noticed for presentment on 11/21/19. Status hearing set for 11/21/19 at 9:00 am. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Status hearing held on 10/29/19. Counsel reports that a motion for default has been noticed for 11/5/19. Status hearing set for 11/5/19 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Martin J. Wasserman for presentment of motion for default judgment, #15 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Wasserman, Martin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association for default judgment as to Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC, Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC and MMN Sharif, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Wasserman, Martin)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to Faris Abusharif on 10/21/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS Report by PNC Bank, National Association (Wasserman, Martin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Wasserman, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association (Wasserman, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by Defendant MMN Sharif, Inc.., SUMMONS Returned Executed by PNC Bank, National Association as to MMN Sharif, Inc. on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (Wasserman, Martin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 10/29/19 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
September 13, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Faris Abusharif, MMN Sharif, Inc., Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC, Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC (yt)
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association by Kurt M. Carlson (Carlson, Kurt)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association by Justin Kyle Malenius (Malenius, Justin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff PNC Bank, National Association by Martin J. Wasserman (Wasserman, Martin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wasserman, Martin)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by PNC Bank, National Association; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16229842. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I)(Wasserman, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Abusharif et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faris Abusharif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Treatment Surgical Suites, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMN Sharif, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pain Treatment Centers of Illinois, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Justin Kyle Malenius
Represented By: Martin J. Wasserman
Represented By: Kurt M. Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?