Singh v. Saul
Plaintiff: Harbhjan Singh
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv06119
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The government is directed to file the administrative record by December 6, 2019. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by February 7, 2020. The government's response and/or cross- motion for summary judgment is due by April 10, 2020. If Plaintiff believes that a reply is necessary, she may file a reply brief by April 24, 2020, but one is not required. Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing the final agency decision must include a section with a recitation of the relevant facts and a separate section identifying the statement of the issues presented in the brief. The statement of issues must set out a numbered list of issues for the court's consideration. The issue statement must also identify with specificity the aspects of the Commissioner's final decision that Plaintiff challenges, along with a concise explanation of why Plaintiff believes the challenged aspects are unsupported by substantial evidence. In the argument section of its response the government must address each issue Plaintiff identifies in her brief's statement of the issues. Mailed notice (ma,)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Young B. Kim, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/22/2019. (rp, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: As the parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge for all further proceedings #6 , all deadlines and hearings set before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Schultz, Barry)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Sarah Fattahi Terman as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Terman, Sarah)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: This matter is before the Court for review of a final decision by the Commissioner of Social Security. The parties should promptly consult with each other to determine whether they will consent to the reassignment of this case to the magistrate judge for all further proceedings. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge, they should file a joint statement of consent pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(a). Otherwise, pursuant to Local Rule 16.4, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review within 60 days after the filing of the answer to the complaint and the administrative record. Within 45 days thereafter, the Commissioner shall its motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days thereafter. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Harbhjan Singh by Barry Alan Schultz (Schultz, Barry)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schultz, Barry)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Harbhjan Singh; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16230451. (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Schultz, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harbhjan Singh
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?