Garretson v. United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brian Garretson
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06130
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing held and continued to 12/3/2019 at 9:30 a.m. to report on settlement. Mailed notice (vcf, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 Defendant's ANSWER to amended complaint and Affirmative Defenses by United Airlines, Inc.(Kim, Jenna)
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED complaint by Brian Garretson against All Defendants (Kline, Mitchell)
October 1, 2019 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment on Count I of Plaintiff's amended complaint #7 is granted. Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) partial motion to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint #11 is withdrawn. Plaintiff's amended complaint is due by 10/8/2019. Defendant's answer is due by 10/22/2019. Status hearing is set for 10/29/2019 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (vcf, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Jenna Kim for presentment of motion for summary judgment #7 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 10/1/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kim, Jenna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Jenna Kim for presentment of motion for summary judgment #7 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Kim, Jenna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by United Airlines, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #11 (Defendant's Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Rule 12(b)(6) Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Kim, Jenna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Kim, Jenna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 APPENDIX Rule 56 statement, #9 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(Kim, Jenna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 56.1(a) Statement by United Airlines, Inc. regarding motion for summary judgment #7 (Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Local Rule 56.1(a) Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Kim, Jenna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM by United Airlines, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment #7 (Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Kim, Jenna)
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant United Airlines, Inc. for summary judgment (Defendant United Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) (Kim, Jenna)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (aee, )
September 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by United Airlines, Inc. (Defendant's Local Rule 3.2 Notification as to Affiliates) (Kim, Jenna)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Jenna Kim (Kim, Jenna)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant United Airlines, Inc. by Shanthi V. Gaur (Gaur, Shanthi)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kim, Jenna)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County - Law Div, case number (2019L006293) filed by United Airlines, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16231793. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H to Notice of Removal)(Kim, Jenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garretson v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Jenna Kim
Represented By: Shanthi V. Gaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Garretson
Represented By: Mitchell A. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?