Ross v. Gambol et al
Plaintiff: Caroline Ross
Defendant: Frank Gambol, Rick Velovski, John Gambol and Patty Gambol
Case Number: 1:2019cv06142
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Frank Gambol, John Gambol, Patty Gambol, Rick Velovski by Jeffrey A Whitehead (Whitehead, Jeffrey)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Caroline Ross as to Rick Velovski on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019. (Borlack, Alan)
October 24, 2019 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Frank Gambol, John Gambol, Patty Gambol. (mc, )
October 18, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Frank Gambol, John Gambol, Patty Gambol, Rick Velovski (kl, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Caroline Ross by Alan R. Borlack (Borlack, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Rick Velovski on 09/13/2019 by Plaintiff Caroline Ross. Waiver of service due by 10/15/2019. (Borlack, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to John Gambol on 09/13/2019 by Plaintiff Caroline Ross. Waiver of service due by 10/15/2019. (Borlack, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Patty Gambol on 09/13/2019 by Plaintiff Caroline Ross. Waiver of service due by 10/15/2019. (Borlack, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Frank Gambol on 09/13/2019 by Plaintiff Caroline Ross. Waiver of service due by 10/15/2019. (Borlack, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Borlack, Alan)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Caroline Ross; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16234874. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F)(Borlack, Alan)
September 13, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Gambol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Ross
Represented By: Alan R. Borlack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Gambol
Represented By: Jeffrey A Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Velovski
Represented By: Jeffrey A Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Gambol
Represented By: Jeffrey A Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Gambol
Represented By: Jeffrey A Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?