Royal Properties, LLC v. Forest Preserve District of Cook County et al
Appellant: Royal Properties, LLC
Appellee: Mary B. Grossman and Forest Preserve District of Cook County
Case Number: 1:2019cv06164
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 FINAL closing order dated 10/8/2019 entered on USBC docket. (sxb, )
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Debtor-Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of bankruptcy appeal #3 is granted. This case is hereby dismissed. The motion hearing set for 10/10/2019 is stricken. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/8/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony J. Peraica for presentment of motion to dismiss #3 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/10/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Peraica, Anthony)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION by Appellant Royal Properties, LLC to dismiss bankruptcy appeal (Peraica, Anthony)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3))(sxb, )
September 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 A 826 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit)(USBC-Rivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Properties, LLC v. Forest Preserve District of Cook County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Royal Properties, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Peraica
Represented By: John Harold Redfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mary B. Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Forest Preserve District of Cook County
Represented By: Victor P. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?