Royalty Properties, LLC v. Cook County Forest Preserve District
Appellee: Cook County Forest Preserve District
Appellant: Royalty Properties, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06169
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 FINAL closing order dated 10/07/2019 entered on USBC docket. (aee, )
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court grants Appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of its bankruptcy appeal #4 . The Court dismisses this appeal with prejudice and with Appellant to pay its own fees and costs. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/7/2019. Mailed notice (aee, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by Anthony J. Peraica for presentment of motion to dismiss #4 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/8/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Peraica, Anthony)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Appellant Royalty Properties, LLC to dismiss Voluntary Dismissal of Bankruptcy Appeal (Peraica, Anthony)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Parties should refer to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8018 regarding the time limits to file briefs for a bankruptcy appeal. Any motions to extend time must be filed within the applicable briefing period. Unless leave is granted, briefs are limited to 15 pages each. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 and Bankruptcy Rule 8010(3) letters with an attorney appearance form to all counsel on record. (kp, )
September 16, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 APPEAL from U.S. Bankruptcy Court case number 19 B 7692 (Judge Cox) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(USBC-Ross, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royalty Properties, LLC v. Cook County Forest Preserve District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cook County Forest Preserve District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Royalty Properties, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Peraica
Represented By: John Harold Redfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?