Smith v. Heisner
Petitioner: Thomas Lavel Smith
Respondent: R. Heisner
Case Number: 1:2019cv06186
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 24 MAILED Prisoner Local Rule 83.15 Letter to all parties of record. (nsf, )
September 16, 2019 Filing 23 RECEIVED from Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00566 (nsf)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court is in receipt of petitioner Thomas Lavel Smith's motion to transfer this matter back to the Northern District of Illinois, on the ground that he has been placed at a halfway house in Chicago (Dkt. # #19 .) As noted when this matter was transferred to this court, the sole venue for petitions seeking relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241 is the district within which the petitioner is confined. Webster v. Daniels, 784 F.3d 1123, 1144 (7th Cir. 2015) (en banc) (citing Rumsfeld v. Padilla, 542 U.S. 426, 434-35 (2004)). In light of Smith's current confinement in Illinois, the motion is GRANTED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631, this matter is TRANSFERRED back to the Northern District of Illinois for further consideration. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 9/16/2019. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 21 Supplement to #19 Motion to Transfer filed by Thomas Lavel Smith. (Attachments: #1 Excerpt of docket sheet, #2 Envelope) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 20 Notice of Change of Address by Petitioner Thomas Lavel Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Petitioner Thomas Lavel Smith providing change of address and requesting case be transferred back to Northern District of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Judge update in case. Case now assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (nln),(ps) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-03313. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin the electronic record. (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
July 11, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated. (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Clerk is instructed to: (1) refund the duplicate $5.00 filing fee to Petitioner; (2) send a copy of this order to the Court's Fiscal Department for processing of the refund; and, (3) update the docket to reflect that Petitioner is incarcerated at FCI Oxford. This case is transferred forthwith to the United States District Court for the Western District of Wisconsin for preliminary consideration. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the notice of motion for Docket Entry 15 in CM/ECF, and close this case number on this Court's docket. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/11/2019. Mailed notice. (bg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Petitioner Thomas Lavel Smith. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 6/19/2019) (ph, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER from the Western District of Michigan regarding documents sent to them (Exhibits) (las, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
May 22, 2019 MAILED a blank IFP application with instructions and Order dated 5/21/2019 to the Plaintiff. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Petitioner is given until June 11, 2019 to either pay the $5 filing fee or file a petition for leave to file in forma pauperis. Petitioner is warned that the Court may dismiss this case if he fails to comply with this order. The Clerk is instructed to (1) update the docket to reflect that Respondent is R. Heisner, Warden, MCC Chicago, and, (2) send Petitioner a blank IFP application with instructions. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/21/2019. Mailed notice (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 MAILED Prisoner Local Rule 83.15 Letter to all parties of record. (ek, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 RECEIVED from Michigan Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-00202 (ek) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
May 16, 2019 CASE ELECTRONICALLY TRANSFERRED to Northern District of Illinois (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #6 ; this matter is transferred to the United States District of Court for the Northern District of Illinois ; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, ymc) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO #6 in support (in letter form) filed by petitioner Thomas Lavel Smith (mg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Copy of Report and Recommendation #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas Lavel Smith #44657-424 (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from petitioner Thomas Lavel Smith regarding petitioner's appeal; Petitioner states that he is not appealing his sentence from 2012, only the sanction he received from the halfway house (clw) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 by petitioner Thomas Lavel Smith (ns) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas Lavel Smith #44657-424 (jlg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (jlg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of docket entry from Northern District of Illinois (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Cover Letter) (jlg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]
March 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by Thomas Lavel Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-F, #2 Attachment 1) (jlg) [Transferred from Michigan Western on 5/16/2019.] [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/11/2019.] [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 9/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Heisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Heisner
Represented By: David Daly Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Lavel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?