Acevedo v. Saul
Plaintiff: Angela M. Acevedo
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv06211
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Young B. Kim: The government is directed to file the administrative record by December 6, 2019. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due by February 7, 2020. The government's response and/or cross- motion for summary judgment is due by April 10, 2020. If Plaintiff believes that a reply is necessary, she may file a reply brief by April 24, 2020, but one is not required. Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing the final agency decision must include a section with a recitation of the relevant facts and a separate section identifying the statement of the issues presented in the brief. The statement of issues must set out a numbered list of issues for the court's consideration. The issue statement must also identify with specificity the aspects of the Commissioner's final decision that Plaintiff challenges, along with a concise explanation of why Plaintiff believes the challenged aspects are unsupported by substantial evidence. In the argument section of its response the government must address each issue Plaintiff identifies in her brief's statement of the issues. Mailed notice (ma,)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING: Case reassigned to the Honorable Young B. Kim, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Edmond E. Chang no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 10/18/2019. (bg, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang:In light of the joint consent to the magistrate judge's jurisdiction, the status hearing of 11/08/2019 is vacated. The consent will be processed with the Executive Committee.Emailed notice (slb, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Haile, Jonathan)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Jonathan C. Haile as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew M. Saul (Haile, Jonathan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 11/08/2019 at 9:30 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases.Emailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, )
September 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Charles, Analeah)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Angela M. Acevedo by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Angela M. Acevedo by Frederick J. Daley, Jr (Daley, Frederick)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Angela M. Acevedo; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16246454. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Daley, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acevedo v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Acevedo
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?