Lloyd v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: Alvin Lloyd
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Whirlpool Corporation
3Rd Party Defendant: FABER S.p.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06225
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Service of Supplemental Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. (Krivoshey, Megan)
October 31, 2019 Filing 19 Supplemental Briefing on Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Whirlpool Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Krivoshey, Megan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. (Krivoshey, Megan)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Alvin Lloyd. (Moor, Edward)
October 10, 2019 Filing 16 Statement of Citizenship in Compliance with Court Order STATEMENT by Alvin Lloyd (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Moor, Edward)
October 9, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 10/9/2019. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 THIRD party complaint by Whirlpool Corporation against FABER S.p.A. .(Krivoshey, Megan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hace Vice (Dckt. No. #12 ) is hereby granted. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16301826. (LeClere, Kyle)
October 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Alvin Lloyd for hearing (Emergency Motion for Inspection) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Moor, Edward)
September 29, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alvin Lloyd by Edward Roy Moor (Moor, Edward)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Whirlpool Corporation(Krivoshey, Megan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Krivoshey, Megan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Megan K. Krivoshey regarding notice of removal, #1 , attorney appearance #3 , statement #4 , civil cover sheet #2 Service (Krivoshey, Megan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to all counsel of record. (smm, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Whirlpool Corporation (Krivoshey, Megan)
September 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Whirlpool Corporation by Megan Kay Krivoshey (Krivoshey, Megan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Krivoshey, Megan)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2019-L-008838) filed by Whirlpool Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16249507. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Krivoshey, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lloyd v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin Lloyd
Represented By: Edward Roy Moor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Megan Kay Krivoshey
Represented By: Kyle W LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: FABER S.p.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?