Williams v. Pearlstein et al
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Defendant: Ellyn M. Pearlstein and Tiffany & Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06226
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MAILED Rule 83.15 letter to all counsel on record. (kp, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIVED from New York Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-08104 (kp)
September 9, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order, to Helene Tonique Williams P.O. Box 641373 Chicago, IL 60664. (aea) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Illinois (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (mro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 9/6/2019) (mro) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Ellyn M. Pearlstein, Tiffany & Co. Document filed by Helene Tonique Williams. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Helene Tonique Williams.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 9/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Pearlstein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellyn M. Pearlstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helene Tonique Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?