Entertainment One UK Ltd. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Plaintiff: Entertainment One UK Ltd.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A", Baby Too Store, Warm House Accessory Store, FenDou Store, La La Houseware Store, kate Official Store, xiaolaixi store, Princess & Th Beast, AliHome Store, morematch morematch Store, AA Beautiful life Store, Shop4855036 Store, For Lovlife Store, Greatful Store, Lovelylife Store, MS Official Store, Sophie fair Store, Dreamme Store, HomeHaven Store, Cekcya Store, Omgod Surprise Store, LONGLONG618 Store, Fashion Shop 4, Shop4962013 Store, Brilliant Fun Party Store, INHONEY Romantic Store, XLXSMT Store, XYZ123 Party Store, 365 Decoration Store, newstart Store, IPartyshow Store, CZFC Store and Tutu Dreams Official Store
Case Number: 1:2019cv06257
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
January 10, 2020 Filing 48 FULL SATISFACTION of Judgment regarding order #46 in the amount of $500,000 as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
December 11, 2019 Filing 47 MAILED Trademark closing report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA with copy of closing order. (nsf, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 46 FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT ORDER signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/9/2019. Mailed notice(ef, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
December 5, 2019 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion and Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff's appeared. Plaintiff's motion for entry of default and default judgment #40 is granted. The Court enters default judgment against all Defendants identified on Schedule A #7 . Enter final judgment order. The ten thousand dollar ($10,000) surety bond posted by Plaintiffs is hereby released to Plaintiffs or their counsel, Greer, Burns & Crain, Ltd. The Clerk of the Court is directed to return the surety bond previously deposited with the Clerk of the Court to Plaintiffs or their counsel. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Isaku Begert (Begert, Isaku)
December 2, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #40 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 41 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for entry of default, motion for default judgment #40 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for entry of default as to all Defendants, MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Gaudio, Justin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain defendants (Martin, Allyson)
December 2, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
November 8, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to certain defendant (Martin, Allyson)
October 23, 2019 Filing 36 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER Signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/23/2019. Mailed notice (nsf, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion and Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #32 is granted. Enter Preliminary Injunction Order. The Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to unseal Schedule A regarding Complaint #7 , Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #8 , Exhibits 3 to the Declaration of Niall Trainor #13 , and the Temporary Restraining Order #24 . Status hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #32 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/23/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #32 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio, #2 Exhibit 1)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Gaudio, Justin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Entertainment One UK Ltd. as to The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A" on 10/18/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jake M. Christensen)(Christensen, Jake)
October 18, 2019 Filing 30 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Jake Michael Christensen (Christensen, Jake)
October 9, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion and Status hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Pursuant to the discussion held in open court, Plaintiff's motion to extend the temporary restraining order #26 is granted. The Court finds that good cause exists to extend the sealed temporary restraining order entered 9/25/2019 #24 for an additional 14 days. The sealed temporary restraining order shall expire on 10/23/2019. Status hearing set for 10/23/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 4, 2019 BOND in the amount of $ 10,000.00, Receipt no. 4624231231 posted by Entertainment One UK Ltd. (jn, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of extension of time #26 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of extension of time #26 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Justin R. Gaudio)(Gaudio, Justin)
October 4, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for extension of time of Temporary Restraining Order (Gaudio, Justin)
September 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant BABY TOO STORE and all other Defendants identified in the Amended Complaint. (acm, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. Only counsel for Plaintiff appeared. Plaintiff having come to be heard on its ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order, including a temporary injunction, a temporary asset restraint, and expedited discovery #9 , the Court finds that Plaintiff has satisfied the requirements for the requested relief, without written or oral notice to the adverse parties, as provided by Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b). Accordingly, the motion is granted. The temporary restraining order is entered effective 4:00 p.m. on 9/25/2019 and shall expire in fourteen (14) days. It is further ordered that Plaintiff shall deposit with the Court ten thousand dollars ($10,000.00) as security, determined adequate for the payment of such damages as any person may be entitled to recover as a result of a wrongful restraint hereunder. Plaintiff's motions for leave to file under seal #6 and motion for electronic service of process #14 are granted. The Clerk is directed to maintain the following documents under seal until further order of this Court: (1) Schedule A regarding Complaint (Dkt. No. #7 ), (2) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Dkt. No. #8 ), and (3) Exhibits 3 to the Declaration of Niall Trainor (Dkt. No. #13 ). Only Plaintiff's counsel and Court staff shall have access to these documents. Status hearing set for 10/9/2019 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TEMPORARY Restraining Order signed by the Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/25/2019. (jjr, ) Modified on 10/30/2019 (nsf, ).
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by RiKaleigh C. Johnson (Johnson, RiKaleigh)
September 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 21 E-MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 20 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibts)(las, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Entertainment One UK Ltd. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Entertainment One UK Ltd. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Justin R. Gaudio for presentment of motion for leave to file #6 , motion for miscellaneous relief #14 , motion for temporary restraining order #9 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 9/25/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #15 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for miscellaneous relief #14 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for Electronic Service of Process Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(f)(3) (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. Exhibit 3 - Parts 1-2 regarding declaration #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-1, #2 Exhibit 3-2)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 10/30/2019 (nsf, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Niall Trainor regarding memorandum in support of motion #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Justin R. Gaudio regarding memorandum in support of motion #10 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM by Entertainment One UK Ltd. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #9 (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for temporary restraining order including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Asset Restraint, and Expedited Discovery (Gaudio, Justin)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 10/30/2019 (nsf, ).
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. Schedule A regarding complaint #1 (Gaudio, Justin) Modified on 10/30/2019 (nsf, ).
September 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. for leave to file under seal (Gaudio, Justin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Allyson M. Martin (Martin, Allyson)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Amy Crout Ziegler (Ziegler, Amy)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Entertainment One UK Ltd. by Justin R. Gaudio (Gaudio, Justin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Gaudio, Justin)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Entertainment One UK Ltd.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16253312. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Schedule A)(Gaudio, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Entertainment One UK Ltd. v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule "A"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baby Too Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warm House Accessory Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FenDou Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La La Houseware Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: kate Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: xiaolaixi store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess & Th Beast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AliHome Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: morematch morematch Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AA Beautiful life Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4855036 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: For Lovlife Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greatful Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lovelylife Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MS Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sophie fair Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamme Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeHaven Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cekcya Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omgod Surprise Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LONGLONG618 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Shop 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shop4962013 Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brilliant Fun Party Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INHONEY Romantic Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XLXSMT Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ123 Party Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 365 Decoration Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: newstart Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IPartyshow Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CZFC Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tutu Dreams Official Store
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Entertainment One UK Ltd.
Represented By: Allyson M. Martin
Represented By: Amy Crout Ziegler
Represented By: Justin R. Gaudio
Represented By: Jake Michael Christensen
Represented By: RiKaleigh C. Johnson
Represented By: Isaku Begert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?