Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC v. EZX, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Jayda Transport, LLC and EZX, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06272
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jayda Transport, LLC by Devin Michael Lindsay (Lindsay, Devin)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew Charles Tidwell-neal for presentment of motion to dismiss #13 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 11/26/2019 at 08:45 AM. (Tidwell-neal, Andrew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant EZX, LLC to dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (Tidwell-neal, Andrew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 ENTERED IN ERROR (Modified on 10/18/2019 by Clerk's Office).
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 ENTERED IN ERROR (Modified on 10/18/2019 by Clerk's Office ).
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant EZX, LLC by Andrew Charles Tidwell-neal (Tidwell-neal, Andrew)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant EZX, LLC by Frederick John Sudekum, III (Sudekum, Frederick)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jayda Transport, LLC by Jason Orleans Appearance on behalf of Deft Jayda (Orleans, Jason)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 12/5/19 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 12/3/19 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Jayda Transport LLC on 09/20/2019 by Plaintiff Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC. Waiver of service due by 10/21/2019. (Tchernev, Ivaylo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to EZX, LLC on 09/20/2019 by Plaintiff Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC. Waiver of service due by 10/21/2019. (Tchernev, Ivaylo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC by Ivaylo V. Tchernev (Tchernev, Ivaylo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Tchernev, Ivaylo)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16256023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Tchernev, Ivaylo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC v. EZX, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jayda Transport, LLC
Represented By: Jason Orleans
Represented By: Devin Michael Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZX, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Charles Tidwell-neal
Represented By: Frederick John Sudekum, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Best Dedicated Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Ivaylo V. Tchernev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?