Leibowitz v. Adler et al
Plaintiff: David P. Leibowitz
Defendant: Jacquelyn Adler and Arthur B. Adler
Case Number: 1:2019cv06273
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT to Motion for Withdrawal of Reference (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Docket Sheet)(USBC-Rivera, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Based on the Motion to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding to the Bankruptcy Court (Dkt. 1) and the Trustee's Response (Dkt. 9), the Motion to Withdraw Reference of Adversary Proceeding to the Bankruptcy Court #1 is granted and the reference to the bankruptcy court is withdrawn. Status hearing is set for 12/4/19 at 10:00am. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by David P. Leibowitz re response to motion #9 (Bauch, Paul)
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE by David P. Leibowitz to MOTION to withdraw reference #1 (Bauch, Paul)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Citation to Discover Assets by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (pk, ) (Linked document has different case number )Modified on 10/17/2019 (pk, ).
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Jacquelyn Adler and Arthur Adler's motion to withdraw reference #1 : response due 10/28/19, reply due 11/12/19. The Court will rule by mail. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David P. Leibowitz by Justin Robert Storer (Storer, Justin)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David P. Leibowitz by Carolina Y. Sales (Sales, Carolina)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David P. Leibowitz by Paul M. Bauch (Bauch, Paul)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Arthur B. Adler, Jacquelyn Adler by Jeffrey Strange (Strange, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 letter with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (pk, )
September 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to withdraw reference (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet)(USBC-Rivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leibowitz v. Adler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacquelyn Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur B. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David P. Leibowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?