Green v. Nestle USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Christine Green
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc. and Ferrara Candy Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06281
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 11/22/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christine Green. Ferrara Candy Company waiver sent on 10/29/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. (Herrera, Julie)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED complaint by Christine Green against All Defendants adding Ferrara Candy Company (Herrera, Julie)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christine Green. Nestle USA, Inc. waiver sent on 9/20/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. (Herrera, Julie)
September 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Christine Green by Julie Herrera (Herrera, Julie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herrera, Julie)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Christine Green; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16257294.(Herrera, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Nestle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nestle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferrara Candy Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Green
Represented By: Julie Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?