Haywood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: David L. Haywood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv06288
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Susan E Cox
Referring Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT filed by David L. Haywood; (bg, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: Plaintiff's Application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. Having reviewed the affidavit and financial application, the Court finds that requiring Plaintiff to pay the filing fee for this case would likely interfere with the necessities of life. See Bryant v. Whalen, No. 88cv4834, 1992 WL 198946, 5 (N.D. Ill. Aug. 12, 1992). Mailed notice (np, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cox. Defendant shall answer of otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 11/19/2019. Also, by 11/19/2019, Defendant shall file a certified copy of the administrative record and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Plaintiff's opening brief is due on or before 1/21/20. Defendant's response brief is due on or before 3/6/20. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due on or before 3/20/20. Mailed notice (np, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned by lot to the Honorable Susan E. Cox for all further proceedings. The designated magistrate judge is participating in the periodic calendar adjustment program pursuant to Internal Operating Procedure 19. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 10/24/19.(smm, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: As the parties have consented to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge for all further proceedings #7 , all deadlines and hearings set before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Olinsky, Howard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Virginia Ovitz Hancock as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Hancock, Virginia)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David L. Haywood by Meredith Emily Marcus (Marcus, Meredith)
September 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David L. Haywood by Howard D. Olinsky (Olinsky, Howard)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff David L. Haywood for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Olinsky, Howard)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olinsky, Howard)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David L. Haywood; (Olinsky, Howard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haywood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Haywood
Represented By: Meredith Emily Marcus
Represented By: Howard D. Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Virginia Ovitz Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?