Butkus et al v. Medina et al
Plaintiff: Mecislovas Butkus and Mr. Arnas Butkus
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan and Martha Medina
Case Number: 1:2019cv06304
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Kevin McAleenan, Martha Medina (Treacy, Elizabeth)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Kevin McAleenan, Martha Medina (Oswald, Craig)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Defendants Kevin McAleenan, Martha Medina , SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus as to All Defendants (Hallagan, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus as to Martha Medina served on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019 (Hallagan, James)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus as to Kevin McAleenan served on 10/2/2019, answer due 12/2/2019 (Hallagan, James)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus by James E. Hallagan (Hallagan, James)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing is set for 12/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus by Robert Daniel Vinikoor (Vinikoor, Robert)
September 24, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Kevin McAleenan, Martha Medina, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (cc, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
September 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Leja, Beata)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus by Beata Anna Leja (Leja, Beata)
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus by Beata Anna Leja (Leja, Beata)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus by Beata Anna Leja (Leja, Beata)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment filed by Arnas Butkus, Mecislovas Butkus; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16259528. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit)(Leja, Beata)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butkus et al v. Medina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mecislovas Butkus
Represented By: Beata Anna Leja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Arnas Butkus
Represented By: Beata Anna Leja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?