Cook County, Illinois et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. and Cook County, Illinois
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI II, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Kevin McAleenan, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, a federal agency, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, a federal agency, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services and Kevin K. McAleenan
Amicus Curiae: Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, Sexual Violence Law Center, Equip for Equality, National Network to End Domestic Violence, Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, National Council of Jewish Women, End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin, Little Lobbyists, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, California Coalition Against Sexual Assault, CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO, Battered Womens Justice Project, Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, American Association of People with Disabilities, Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence, National Council on Independent Living, Texas Council on Family Violence, Delaware Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Legal Voice, American Civil Liberties Union, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, The Arc of the United States, Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Federation of the Blind, National Domestic Violence Hotline, Violence Free Colorado, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence, New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Mental Health America, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, National Resource Center on Domestic Violence, National Disability Rights Network, Ohio Domestic Violence Network, Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Disability Rights Advocates, Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence, United Spinal Association, Jane Doe Inc., The North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence, South Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, The Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence, Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence, California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence, API Chaya, Center for Public Representation, Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, PUBLIC HEALTH, HEALTH POLICY, MEDICINE, AND NURSING DEANS, CHAIRS AND SCHOLARS; THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION; AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Immigration Reform Law Institute, Casa de Esperanza, National Survivor Network, Tahirih Justice Center and Legal Momentum
Case Number: 1:2019cv06334
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 46:1156
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 107 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security by Kuntal Cholera (Cholera, Kuntal)
November 14, 2019 Filing 105 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:When preparing for today's hearing, the court found some non-substantive errors in its preliminary injunction opinion #86 . Accordingly, the court enters a corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order. Most of the corrections involve citations, and none are substantive. Enter Corrected Memorandum Opinion and Order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 104 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held and continued to 1/7/2020 at 10:00 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Defendants' motion for stay of injunction pending appeal #90 is denied. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by 1/16/2020. Motion hearing set for 1/22/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Defendants shall file the administrative record by 11/25/2019. By agreement, simultaneous briefs as to discovery on the equal protection claim shall be filed by 12/5/2019; responses due by 12/19/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 103 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Marlow Elizabeth Svatek (Svatek, Marlow)
November 7, 2019 Filing 102 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The 11/14/2019 hearing #94 will proceed as scheduled. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 101 Notice of Waiver of Reply and Hearing by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Kolsky, Joshua)
November 6, 2019 Filing 100 RESPONSE by Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security to stay Preliminary Injunction #90 (Gordon, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 99 ACKNOWLEDGMENT of receipt of short record on appeal regarding notice of appeal #96 ; USCA Case No. 19-3169 (sxb, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 98 TRANSMITTED to the 7th Circuit the short record on notice of appeal #96 . Notified counsel. (sxb, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record regarding notice of appeal #96 (sxb, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of appeal by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security regarding orders #87 , #86 Receipt number: y (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 30, 2019 Filing 95 STATUS Report (Joint, Initial) by Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. (Gordon, David)
October 30, 2019 Filing 94 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. Motion for stay of injunction pending appeal #90 is entered and continued. Plaintiffs' response due by 11/6/2019; Defendants' reply due by 11/11/2019. The 11/5/2019 status hearing #85 is stricken and re-set for 11/14/2019 at 10:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 93 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Defendant's motion for stay of injunction pending appeal #90 set for 10/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. #89 is re-set for 9:30 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 92 DECLARATION of Daniel Renaud regarding motion to stay #90 (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security in support of motion to stay #90 (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION by Defendants Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security to stay Preliminary Injunction (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 25, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Kolsky for presentment of before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/30/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 16, 2019 Filing 88 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Meghan Patricia Carter (Carter, Meghan)
October 14, 2019 Filing 106 CORRECTED MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/14/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 87 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND STAY ORDER signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/14/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 86 MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/14/2019.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 85 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:For the reasons set forth in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion and Order, Plaintiff's emergency motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction or stay #24 is granted. Enter preliminary injunction and stay orderInitial status hearing set for 11/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 10/30/2019.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 14, 2019 Filing 84 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The 10/8/2019 order #76 is amended to add the word "not" between the words "would" and "have" in its final sentence.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 13, 2019 Filing 83 Supplemental Brief Regarding Mootness by Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. (Gordon, David)
October 13, 2019 Filing 82 MEMORANDUM motion for temporary restraining order #24 by Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kolsky, Joshua)
October 11, 2019 Filing 81 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing on Plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction or stay #24 held. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 80 REPLY by Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. Reply Brief in support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and or Preliminary Injunction or Stay (Gordon, David)
October 9, 2019 Filing 79 Brief of Amicus Curiae by Immigration Reform Law Institute (Olowski, Lew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 78 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file amicus brief #71 is granted. Amicus Immigration Reform Law Institute shall file its amicus brief as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 10/8/2019 #72 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 77 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Immigration Reform Law Institute by David John Shestokas (Shestokas, David)
October 8, 2019 Filing 76 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Because all parties have submitted Canon 3D remittal letters #74 , this case will remain assigned to Judge Feinerman. The Clerk entered the remittal letters on the docket only because all parties submitted them; had any party not submitted a remittal letter, any letter that had been submitted would have been entered on the docket.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 75 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction or stay #45 set for 10/11/2019 at 12:15 p.m. is re-set for 1:00 p.m. Central Time. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461.TIME CHANGE ONLY.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 74 Canon 3D waiver letters. (jlj, )
October 8, 2019 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security in Opposition to motion for temporary restraining order #24 (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 8, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE of Motion by Lew Olowski for presentment of motion for leave to file, #71 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/8/2019 at 01:00 PM. (Olowski, Lew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 71 MOTION by Amicus Immigration Reform Law Institute for leave to file Brief as Amicus Curiae (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae Immigration Reform Law Institute, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Filing Motion For Leave To File Brief As Amicus Curiae)(Olowski, Lew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 70 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Immigration Reform Law Institute by Lew Olowski (Olowski, Lew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 69 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Lew Olowski's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #66 granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 68 MEMORANDUM by Nonprofit Anti-Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Organizations (docket entry corrected) (Roth, Charles)
October 7, 2019 Filing 67 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security by Joshua Kolsky (Kolsky, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 66 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16310877. (Olowski, Lew)
October 4, 2019 Filing 65 ENTERED in Error. (Roth, Charles) Modified on 10/21/2019 (smm, ).
October 4, 2019 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 9/27/19 before the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Order Number: 36270. Court Reporter Contact Information: Frances Ward - (312)435-5561 - wardofficialtranscripts@gmail.com. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2020. (Ward, Frances)
October 4, 2019 Filing 63 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to appear #58 is granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cook County, Illinois as to U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 (Morrison, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cook County, Illinois as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 (Morrison, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cook County, Illinois as to Kevin K. McAleenan served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 (Morrison, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cook County, Illinois as to U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019 (Morrison, David)
October 4, 2019 Filing 58 Amendedfor Phillip A. Escoriaza MOTION by Amicus PUBLIC HEALTH, HEALTH POLICY, MEDICINE, AND NURSING DEANS, CHAIRS AND SCHOLARS; THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION; AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice (Filing Fee Paid for Dkt. 51) Amendedfor Phillip A. Escoriaza (Escoriaza, Phillip)
October 4, 2019 Filing 57 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to appear pro hac vice #49 and #51 are granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 56 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file of Amici Curiae Nonprofit Anti-Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Organizations in support of Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #48 is granted. Amicus shall file its amicus brief as a separate docket entry. Motion hearing set for 10/8/2019 #50 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO by Stephen J Kane (Kane, Stephen)
October 3, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO re other #53 Notice of Filing (Hirsch, Rebecca)
October 3, 2019 Filing 53 Brief of Amici Curiae by CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO the City of Los Angeles, the City of Oakland, the County of Harris Texas, and 26 other local governments (Hirsch, Rebecca)
October 3, 2019 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO by Rebecca Alfert Hirsch (Hirsch, Rebecca)
October 3, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16303636. (Escoriaza, Phillip)
October 3, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Motion by Charles Roth for presentment of motion for leave to file #48 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/8/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Roth, Charles)
October 3, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16303574. (Waters, Edward)
October 3, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION by Unknown Nonprofit Anti-Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Organizations for leave to file brief amicus curiae (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed amicus brief)(Roth, Charles)
October 3, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Parties API Chaya, ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence, Battered Womens Justice Project, California Coalition Against Sexual Assault, California Partnership to End Domestic Violence, Casa de Esperanza, Delaware Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence, Illinois Accountability Initiative, Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Legal Momentum, Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence, Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, National Coalition Against Domestic Violence, National Council of Jewish Women, National Domestic Violence Hotline, National Network to End Domestic Violence, National Survivor Network, Tahirih Justice Center, Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence, Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence, New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence, Ohio Domestic Violence Network, Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Sexual Violence Law Center, South Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault, Texas Council on Family Violence, The Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence, The North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence, Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, Violence Free Colorado, Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs, Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence by Charles Roth (Roth, Charles)
October 3, 2019 Filing 46 Enter Notice Concerning Waiver of Judicial Disqualification. Judge Feinerman was a partner at Sidley Austin LLP, counsel for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc., from 2007-2010. He currently has two 401(k) plans and a cash benefit plan from his time at Sidley Austin; all three plans are held through Schwab. As noted by Sections 3.3-2(b) and (b)(2) of the Compendium of Selected Opinions, this results in a circumstance where the judge's impartiality might reasonably be questioned under Canon 3(C)(1), though for which a remittal of disqualification may be entered under Canon 3(D) if the parties unanimously agree. Please note the 10/8/2019 deadline for submitting the remittal letters to the Clerk of Court.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction or stay #24 set for 10/11/2019 at 12:15 p.m. Attorneys who wish to participate by telephone at the hearing should call Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by PUBLIC HEALTH, HEALTH POLICY, MEDICINE, AND NURSING DEANS, CHAIRS AND SCHOLARS; THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION; AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING re other #43 (Brookstein, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 43 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS by PUBLIC HEALTH, HEALTH POLICY, MEDICINE, AND NURSING DEANS, CHAIRS AND SCHOLARS; THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION; AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING (Brookstein, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus PUBLIC HEALTH, HEALTH POLICY, MEDICINE, AND NURSING DEANS, CHAIRS AND SCHOLARS; THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION; AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING by Mark Douglas Brookstein (Brookstein, Mark)
October 3, 2019 Filing 41 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus PUBLIC HEALTH, HEALTH POLICY, MEDICINE, AND NURSING DEANS, CHAIRS AND SCHOLARS; THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION; AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING by David N. Michael (Michael, David)
October 3, 2019 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to appear pro hac vice #32 , #33 , #34 , #35 , #38 and #39 are granted.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16299808. (Lawrence, Paul)
October 2, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16299139. (Peterson, Alanna)
October 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Equip for Equality, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association re other,,, #36 Brief of Amici Curiae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Zubick, Marc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 36 Brief of Amici Curiae The American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, et al. in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by American Association of People with Disabilities, American Civil Liberties Union, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Center for Public Representation, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Equip for Equality, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association (Zubick, Marc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16297704. (Sprague, Charles)
October 2, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16297678. (Aguilar, Diana)
October 2, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16297650. (Virgien, Kyle)
October 2, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16297595. (Ray, Sarah)
October 2, 2019 Filing 31 ATTORNEY Appearance for Amicus Parties American Civil Liberties Union, Center for Public Representation, American Association of People with Disabilities, Association of University Centers on Disabilities, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center, Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation, Disability Rights Advocates, Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund, Equip for Equality, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Little Lobbyists, Mental Health America, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Council on Independent Living, National Disability Rights Network, National Federation of the Blind, The Arc of the United States, United Spinal Association by Marc N. Zubick (Zubick, Marc)
September 30, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motions to appear pro hac vice #14 and #19 are granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion hearing held on 9/27/2019. Defendant's response to Plaintiffs' emergency motion for temporary restraining order and/or preliminary injunction or stay #24 due by 10/8/2019 at 1:00 p.m. Central Time; Plaintiffs' reply due by 10/10/2019 at 3:00 p.m. Central Time. Amicus briefs in support of Plaintiffs must be filed by 10/3/2019 at 5:00 p.m. Central Time. Amicus brief in support of Defendants must be filed by 10/8/2019 at 1:00 p.m. The court will advise the parties of a motion ruling hearing time in a separate minute order. Mailed notice (cn).
September 27, 2019 Filing 28 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security by Eric J. Soskin (Soskin, Eric)
September 26, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM by Cook County, Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. in support of motion for temporary restraining order #24 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-6)(Morrison, David)
September 26, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Motion for leave to file excess pages #23 is granted, Plaintiffs shall file their memorandum as a separate docket entry. Mailed notice (ags, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 Plaintiffs' Notice of Emergency Motions NOTICE of Motion by David E. Morrison for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #23 , motion for temporary restraining order #24 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/27/2019 at 10:15 AM. (Morrison, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cook County, Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. for temporary restraining order and/or Preliminary Injunction or Stay Pursuant to 5 U.S.C. 705 (Morrison, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION by Plaintiffs Cook County, Illinois, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.( PLAINTIFFS' EMERGENCY LOCAL RULE 7.1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 15 PAGES) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morrison, David)
September 25, 2019 Filing 22 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Honorable John Robert Blakey no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 9/25/2019. (sxb, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Nanshelmun Ruth Dashan (Dashan, Nanshelmun)
September 25, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Kevin K. McAleenan, U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (cc, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: One of the attorneys appearing in this case served as a law clerk to this Court within the past year. As a result, this Court hereby exercises its discretion under 28 U.S.C. Section 455 and requests that this case be referred to the Executive Committee for reassignment. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16266542. (Velevis, Robert)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois by Lauren Elizabeth Miller (Miller, Lauren)
September 24, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lw, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by Jessica Megan Scheller Office of the Cook County State's Attorney (Scheller, Jessica)
September 23, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Andrea Marie Kovach (Kovach, Andrea)
September 23, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Gavin Michael Kearney (Kearney, Gavin)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16265691. (Ostolaza, Yvette)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Katherine Elizabeth Walz (Walz, Katherine)
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Tacy Fletcher Flint (Flint, Tacy)
September 23, 2019 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. (Gordon, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Militza Marie Pagan Lopez ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Militza M.Pagan (Pagan Lopez, Militza)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by David Andrew Gordon (Gordon, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by Juan Carlos Arguello (Arguello, Juan)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by Takayuki Ono (Ono, Takayuki)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by A Colin Wexler (Wexler, A)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc. by Caroline Goodwin Chapman (Chapman, Caroline)
September 23, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by Steven A. Levy (Levy, Steven)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity by David E. Morrison (Morrison, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Morrison, David)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF filed by Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity, Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16265670.(Morrison, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cook County, Illinois et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI II, in his official capacity as Acting Director of U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan, in his official capacity as Acting Secretary of U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, a federal agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, a federal agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenshiup and Immigration Services
Represented By: Joshua Kolsky
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Kuntal Cholera
Represented By: Eric J. Soskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook County, Illinois, an Illinois governmental entity
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Represented By: Steven A. Levy
Represented By: Jessica Megan Scheller
Represented By: A Colin Wexler
Represented By: Juan Carlos Arguello
Represented By: Takayuki Ono
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois Coalition for Immigrant and Refugee Rights, Inc.
Represented By: Caroline Goodwin Chapman
Represented By: Katherine Elizabeth Walz
Represented By: Militza Marie Pagan Lopez
Represented By: David Andrew Gordon
Represented By: Gavin Michael Kearney
Represented By: Andrea Marie Kovach
Represented By: Tacy Fletcher Flint
Represented By: Marlow Elizabeth Svatek
Represented By: Robert S. Velevis
Represented By: Yvette Ostolaza
Represented By: Meghan Patricia Carter
Represented By: Nanshelmun Ruth Dashan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cook County, Illinois
Represented By: Jessica Megan Scheller
Represented By: Juan Carlos Arguello
Represented By: Takayuki Ono
Represented By: Steven A. Levy
Represented By: A Colin Wexler
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Miller
Represented By: David E. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nevada Coalition to End Domestic and Sexual Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sexual Violence Law Center
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Equip for Equality
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Network to End Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington Coalition of Sexual Assault Programs
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council of Jewish Women
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: End Domestic Abuse Wisconsin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Little Lobbyists
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Autistic Self Advocacy Network
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Coalition Against Sexual Assault
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By: Stephen J Kane
Represented By: Rebecca Alfert Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Battered Womens Justice Project
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Vermont Network Against Domestic and Sexual Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Montana Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Alliance to End Sexual Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Association of People with Disabilities
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Arizona Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Idaho Coalition Against Sexual & Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Council on Independent Living
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Texas Council on Family Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Delaware Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Voice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Arc of the United States
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Rhode Island Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Domestic Violence Hotline
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Violence Free Colorado
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois Accountability Initiative
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Maine Coalition to End Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: New Jersey Coalition to End Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Mental Health America
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Coelho Center for Disability Law, Policy and Innovation
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Resource Center on Domestic Violence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Disability Rights Network
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Ohio Domestic Violence Network
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nebraska Coalition to End Sexual and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Civil Rights Education and Enforcement Center
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kentucky Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Association of University Centers on Disabilities
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disability Rights Advocates
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Illinois Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: United Spinal Association
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Jane Doe Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The North Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: South Carolina Coalition Against Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: The Massachusetts Coalition Against Sexual Assault and Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Washington State Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Partnership to End Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Iowa Coalition Against Domestic Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: API Chaya
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Center for Public Representation
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Asian Pacific Institute on Gender-Based Violence
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PUBLIC HEALTH, HEALTH POLICY, MEDICINE, AND NURSING DEANS, CHAIRS AND SCHOLARS; THE AMERICAN PUBLIC HEALTH ASSOCIATION; AND THE AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING
Represented By: Mark Douglas Brookstein
Represented By: Phillip Anselm Escoriaza
Represented By: David N. Michael
Represented By: Edward Todd Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASISTA Immigration Assistance
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund
Represented By: Marc N. Zubick
Represented By: Sarah M. Ray
Represented By: Diana A. Aguilar
Represented By: Kyle A. Virgien
Represented By: Charles Sprague
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Represented By: Lew Olowski
Represented By: David John Shestokas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Casa de Esperanza
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Survivor Network, Tahirih Justice Center
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Legal Momentum
Represented By: Charles Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?