RooR International BV et al v. Areba Fashions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RooR International BV and Sream, Inc
Defendant: Mohammed F. Hussain, Areba Fashions, Inc. d/b/a Green Arch Food Mart and Areba Fashions Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv06492
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Areba Fashions Inc, and Mohammed F. Hussain. (acm, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Joint status report due by 12/4/2019. Status hearing set for 12/9/2019 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 10/9/2019:Mailed notice(srn, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 E-MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 E-MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(las, )
October 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs RooR International BV, Sream, Inc by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16288810. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. USPTO- Notice of Recordation of Assignment, #2 Exhibit B. RooR Trademark Registrations, #3 Exhibit C. License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D. Agreement Scream Roor international, #5 Exhibit E. Product Purchase from Defendant, #6 Exhibit PI report, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RooR International BV et al v. Areba Fashions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed F. Hussain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Areba Fashions, Inc. d/b/a Green Arch Food Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Areba Fashions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?