PCS Sales (USA), Inc. et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: PCS Sales (USA), Inc., Agrium (U.S.), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc. and PCS Nitrogen, Inc.
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company and BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06505
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Kerry Mohan (Mohan, Kerry)
November 20, 2019 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Sean Christopher Gingrich (Gingrich, Sean)
November 20, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. by Daniel J. Mohan (Mohan, Daniel)
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr pursuant to Local Rule 40.4, case related to 19 CV 6504 for all further proceedings. Honorable Virginia M. Kendall no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/19/19. (smm, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 Petition (NOT Motion) Notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support of defendants' notice of potential tag-along actions to MDL no. 1869 and Motion for transfer, consolidation, and/or coordination of rail freight fuel surcharge antitrust actions, #2 Schedule of actions, #3 Exhibit A) (kp, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. of filing Motion to Reassign and Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Reassign and Consolidate for Pre-Trial Purposes (Conagra Case))(Schapiro, Andrew)
November 8, 2019 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Stipulated Motion for extension of time to file Response to Plaintiff's Complaint #17 is granted. Answer shall be due by 12/16/2019. Motion hearing set for 11/13/2019 is stricken. Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Initial Status hearing set for 1/15/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time, #17 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/13/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiffs Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 30, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Parties' Stipulated Motion for extension of time to file Response to Plaintiff's Complaint #14 is granted. Answer shall be due by 11/7/2019. Motion hearing set for 11/5/2019 is stricken. Mailed notice (lk, )
October 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Andrew H. Schapiro for presentment of extension of time, #14 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 11/5/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiffs Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. for extension of time to respond to Complaint (Stipulated Motion on behalf of all Parties) (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Attorneys Sami Rashid and Stephen Neuwirth's Motions to appear pro hac vice #6 and #7 are granted. Mailed notice (lk, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Union Pacific Railroad Company c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Norfolk Southern Railway Company c/o Corporation Service Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on CSX Transportation, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiffs Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. regarding Summons, Complaint, Corporate Disclosure Statement served on BNSF Railway Company c/o The Corporation Trust Company on 10/7/2019 (Schapiro, Andrew)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356522. (Rashid, Sami)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16356443. (Neuwirth, Stephen)
October 3, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (lw, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
October 1, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc., PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc. by Andrew H. Schapiro (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schapiro, Andrew)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by PCS Phosphate Company, Inc., Agrium (U.S.), Inc., PCS Sales (USA), Inc., White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc., PCS Nitrogen, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16289554.(Schapiro, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PCS Sales (USA), Inc. et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Kerry Mohan
Represented By: Sean Christopher Gingrich
Represented By: Daniel J. Mohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCS Sales (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agrium (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Springs Agricultural Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCS Phosphate Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PCS Nitrogen, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Sami Husayn Rashid
Represented By: Stephen R Neuwirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?