Thomas v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marilyn Thomas
Defendant: Biomet, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD and Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06549
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Upon review of the recent correspondence from counsel, this case remains set for further status hearing in January 2020. However, on the Court's own motion and due to the Court's trial calendar, the status hearing set for 1/13/2020 is reset to 1/21/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice. notice (cdh, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Status hearing held on 10/21/2019 and continued to 1/13/2020 at 10:30 a.m. to set pre-trial deadlines, fact discovery cut-off date, and expert schedule. By 11/4/2019, parties to notify the Court as to whether they would like a referral to Magistrate Judge Valdez for settlement conference or whether they will be seeking mediation. Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #57 is granted. Parties' oral motion for agreed protective order is granted. Counsel to submit an agreed proposed order. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 58 STATUS Report Joint by Marilyn Thomas (James, Randy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16348830. (James, Randy)
October 17, 2019 Filing 56 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. by Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Ruben)
October 17, 2019 Filing 55 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marilyn Thomas by Ervin Bryce Nevitt (Nevitt, Ervin)
October 17, 2019 Filing 54 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marilyn Thomas by Ben Adam Crane (Crane, Ben)
October 17, 2019 Filing 53 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. by John A. Roberts (Roberts, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 52 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. by Heather Lyn Burgess (Burgess, Heather)
October 7, 2019 Filing 51 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 10/21/2019 at 10:30 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report by 10/17/2019. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 50 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 49 RECEIVED from Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00468 (jjr)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE: On the court's own motion, Status Conference set for 10/7/19 is RESET to 11/12/2019 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FOURTH TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing LLC of Second Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Group 7 Remand Case List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 46 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by attys John Winter and Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included the status of discovery in Groups 8A and 8B, remand and transfer of Group 7 cases, and disposition of settled cases. Next status conference set for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 OPINION AND ORDER : Plaintiffs Executive Committees motion to modify future remand/transfer orders [Doc. No. 3767 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/6/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED REMAND/TRANSFER SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines to applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A and B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/2/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 REMAND/TRANSFER SHCEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A, and 8B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER : The status conference previously scheduled for July 18, 2019 is now RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MAY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE : Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for July 18, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 39 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. Winter. The court hears from the parties. Next Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter T. Gallucci.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 OPINION AND ORDER: The Cuckler defendants' #10 MOTION to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/7/19. (jld) Modified on 3/18/2019 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 35 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. The Court hears from parties. The next Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Status Conference to be held on 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/27/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 32 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 30 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ACTIVATING DISCOVERY GROUP 7 Identifies cases to be included in Group 7 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 12/14/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 7/12/2019. The parties are directed to confer and file a report within 90 days of the date of this order regarding management of all remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-14-18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 19 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 10, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Marilyn Thomas re #13 Response to Motion, #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Deposition Transcript (Attachments: #1 Transcript and Exhibits)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Marilyn Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John Cuckler, MD, Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Marilyn Thomas. All Defendants answer due date 8/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Maglio PHV, Altom) Modified on 7/5/2018 to add answer due date(nae). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 21, 2018 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3599844.), filed by Marilyn Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maglio PHV, Altom) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John David LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cuckler, MD
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John David LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Thomas
Represented By: Ilyas Sayeg PHV
Represented By: Altom M Maglio PHV
Represented By: Michele S Stephan PHV
Represented By: Brian S Franciskato PHV
Represented By: Ben Adam Crane
Represented By: Brian S Franciskato
Represented By: Ervin Bryce Nevitt
Represented By: Randy W James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?