Moore v. Cuckler, MD et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Moore
Defendant: Biomet, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD and Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06550
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 68 CERTIFICATE Service of Rule 26 Disclosures (Franciskato, Brian)
October 31, 2019 Filing 67 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Status hearing held on 10/31/2019. Attorney Brian Franciskato's motion to appear pro hac vice #64 is granted. Attorney Randy James' motion to appear pro hac vice #65 is granted. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures are due 11/29/2019. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures are due 7/31/2020; defendant's due by 9/16/2020. All discovery ordered closed by 11/30/2020. Dispositive motions are due by 1/8/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/29/2021 at 9:30 a.m. Telephone status hearing, to be initiated by the parties, is set for 1/9/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 66 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Motion by Brian S Franciskato for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #65 , motion to appear pro hac vice #64 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/31/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Franciskato, Brian)
October 30, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16389469. (James, Randy)
October 24, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16372869. (Franciskato, Brian)
October 24, 2019 Filing 63 STATUS Report (Joint) by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Roberts, John)
October 24, 2019 Filing 62 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sharon Moore by Ervin Bryce Nevitt (Nevitt, Ervin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 61 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sharon Moore by Ben Adam Crane (Crane, Ben)
October 18, 2019 Filing 60 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case having been remanded from the MDL transferee court, a status hearing is set for 10/31/2019 at 9:30 AM. The parties are to be prepared to set a trial date at the hearing. By no later then 10/24/2019, the parties are to file a joint status report describing what remains to be done, if anything, to make the case trial-ready, the anticipated length of trial, the status of any settlement discussions, and any other matters the parties want to bring to the Court's attention. (mk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 59 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. by Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez (Gonzalez, Ruben)
October 17, 2019 Filing 58 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. by John A. Roberts (Roberts, John)
October 15, 2019 Filing 57 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. by Heather Lyn Burgess (Burgess, Heather)
October 2, 2019 Filing 56 MAILED Rule 83.15 Letter to all Counsel of Record. (jjr, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 55 RECEIVED from Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00258 (jjr)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE: On the court's own motion, Status Conference set for 10/7/19 is RESET to 11/12/2019 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FOURTH TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/18/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by Biomet Manufacturing LLC of Second Amended Joint Proposed Discovery Group 7 Remand Case List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Filing 52 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 8/8/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by attys John Winter and Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included the status of discovery in Groups 8A and 8B, remand and transfer of Group 7 cases, and disposition of settled cases. Next status conference set for Monday, October 7, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 OPINION AND ORDER : Plaintiffs Executive Committees motion to modify future remand/transfer orders [Doc. No. 3767 ] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on August 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/6/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 AMENDED REMAND/TRANSFER SCHEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines to applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A and B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/2/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REMAND/TRANSFER SHCEDULE FOR DISCOVERY GROUPS 7 AND 8 This order sets forth the remand and/or transfer deadlines applicable to Discovery Groups 7, 8A, and 8B. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/2019. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER : The status conference previously scheduled for July 18, 2019 is now RESET for Thursday, August 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. (E.D.T.) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/25/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MAY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE : Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for July 18, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 45 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by attys E. Hanig, J. Winter. The court hears from the parties. Next Status Conference set for 7/18/2019 01:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter T. Gallucci.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING #16 Motion for Leave to File sur-reply; GRANTING #9 Motion to dismiss Cuckler defendants for lack of personal jurisdiction. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 3/27/2019.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/7/19. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 4, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for May 9, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/4/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 41 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter. The Court hears from parties. The next Status Conference is set for 5/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written memorandum to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Status Conference to be held on 3/4/2019 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/27/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 38 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 36 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ACTIVATING DISCOVERY GROUP 7 Identifies cases to be included in Group 7 for purposes of case-specific discovery and related deadlines. Completed and updated medical records authorizations to be provided to Biomet by 12/14/2018. Case-specific Discovery deadline is 7/12/2019. The parties are directed to confer and file a report within 90 days of the date of this order regarding management of all remaining cases. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11-14-18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 25 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 22 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 18 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE by Sharon Moore re #13 Response to Motion to Dismiss Cuckler Defendants (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Erika Banfelder)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Plaintiff Sharon Moore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Surreply)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sharon Moore. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-G)(Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 13, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michele S Stephan PHV on behalf of Sharon Moore (Stephan PHV, Michele) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support of #9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 8 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 7 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
May 8, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sharon Moore. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Maglio PHV, Altom) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
April 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc., Biomet Manufacturing, LLC, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc., John Cuckler, MD (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
April 13, 2018 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]
April 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3537127.), filed by Sharon Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maglio PHV, Altom) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 10/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Cuckler, MD et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Moore
Represented By: Ilyas Sayeg PHV
Represented By: Altom M Maglio PHV
Represented By: Michele S Stephan PHV
Represented By: Brian S Franciskato PHV
Represented By: Ben Adam Crane
Represented By: Randy Wayne James
Represented By: Brian S Franciskato
Represented By: Ervin Bryce Nevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing, LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama Medical Consultants, Inc.
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cuckler, MD
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: John Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John David LaDue
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: Heather Lyn Burgess
Represented By: Ruben Ignacio Gonzalez
Represented By: John A. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?