United States of America v. Floyd
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marshawn L Floyd
Case Number: 1:2019cv06578
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff United States of America by Matthew Hernandez (Hernandez, Matthew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The Government shall respond to Defendant's 2255 motion #2 by 10/29/2019; Defendant may reply by 11/19/2019. Status hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 9:50 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Marshawn L Floyd (16-cr-412) (Envelope postmarked 9/23/2019) (cc, )
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (cc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshawn L Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Represented By: Brian R. Havey
Represented By: Matthew Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?