Abbott Laboratories v. Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Abbott Laboratories
Defendant: Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited and Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06587
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status and motion hearing held on 2/13/2020. Motions #18 , #20 , #22 , #24 are withdrawn without prejudice. Defendant's answer and counterclaim are due by 3/16/2020. Status hearing set for 4/14/2020 at 9:30 AM to report on settlement, set discovery schedule, and how Plaintiff will respond to counterclaim. Mailed notice (rj, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. by Melissa Haulcomb (Haulcomb, Melissa)
February 6, 2020 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: At the request of the parties, the pre-settlement telephonic status conference set for 2/24/20 with the magistrate judge is RESET to 2/28/20 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel are further instructed to make the necessary arrangements with one another for counsel to jointly be on the line and call in to Judge Fuentes' chambers at 312-435-7570. Mailed notice. (jj, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Settlement conference held. The parties did not reach an agreement to settle the matter. The parties agreed to continue negotiating. A pre-settlement telephonic conference is set for 11:00 a.m. on 2/24/20. The parties should call in jointly to chambers at that time. Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: In light of the settlement conference set with the Magistrate Judge, the status and motion hearing set on 2/5/2020 is reset to 2/13/2020 at 1:30 p.m.Mailed notice (sxw, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Pre-settlement telephonic conference held. The parties report as to their readiness for the settlement conference set for 11:30 a.m. on 2/05/20. Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 8, 2020 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: At the request and by agreement of the parties, the Settlement Conference set for 1/16/20 with Magistrate Judge Fuentes is stricken and reset to 2/05/20 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1838. All other deadlines and orders as stated in the minute order dated 12/11/19 (doc. #30 ) remain unchanged. By agreement, the pre-settlement telephone status hearing set for 1/13/20 at 2:00 p.m. remains as scheduled. Counsel are further instructed to make the necessary arrangements with one another for counsel to jointly be on the line and call in to Judge Fuentes' chambers at 312-435-7570. Mailed notice. (jj, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 31 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 12/4/19 before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Order Number: 37032. Court Reporter Contact Information: Patrick Mullen, (312) 435-5565, patrick_mullen@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 1/27/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2020. (Mullen, Patrick)
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of the case and that they are interested in participating in a settlement conference. The matter is set for a Settlement Conference with Magistrate Judge Fuentes on 1/16/20 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom #1838. The parties are further directed to have a meet and confer by no later than 1/08/20 concerning settlement. Counsel shall simultaneously submit written itemizations of damages and settlement demands to one another with brief mediation statements to explain why such a settlement is appropriate by no later than 3:00 p.m. on 1/10/20. Each party shall provide its settlement letter to Judge Fuentes (by e-mail to Settlement_Correspondence_Fuentes@ilnd.uscourts.gov) on the same day that the letters are simultaneously exchanged. Counsel are directed to appear for a pre-settlement status hearing by telephone on 1/13/20 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel are further instructed to make the necessary arrangements with one another for counsel to jointly be on the line and call in to Judge Fuentes' chambers at 312-435-7570. At the pre-settlement telephone status conference, counsel should be prepared to address, among other things: (a) their continued willingness to attempt to settle the matter at a settlement conference with the Court upon their exchange of written settlement proposals; (b) their respective views about possible impediments to settlement; (c) the status of the litigation, including pendency of motions, progress of discovery, and discovery cutoff dates; (d) any supplementation of mediation statements, if any, previously provided by the Parties; and (e) confirmation by the Parties that the attending client representatives will have full authority to settle the matter up to the full extent of the respective settlement proposals. The Parties are further directed to review the Court's Standing Order for Settlement Conferences, available at the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges. Mailed notice. (jj, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: At the status conference scheduled for 12/11/19 before the magistrate judge, the parties should be prepared to discuss the availability of counsel and the availability of their party representatives (with full and complete authority as that term is used in the Court's Standing Order for Settlement Conference, available on the Court's website) for a settlement conference at 1:30 p.m. on 1/14/20 or 1:30 p.m. on 1/16/20. Mailed notice. (dal, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The matter has been referred to this Court for the purpose of holding proceedings related to a settlement conference (doc. #27 ). The matter is set for an initial status hearing before Magistrate Judge Fuentes on 12/11/19 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom #1838. Mailed notice. (jj, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.(rj, )Mailed notice.
December 4, 2019 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 12/4/2019. All pending motions #18 , #20 , #22 , #24 are entered and continued to 2/5/2020 at 9:45 AM. Referral entered to Magistrate Judge Fuentes for settlement conference. Status hearing set for 2/5/2020 at 9:45 AM to set briefing schedule on pending motions, if case does not settle. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Motion by Devon Curtis Beane for presentment of motion to seal, #24 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. to seal Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration (Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Devon Curtis Beane for presentment of Sealed motion, #22 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 22 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. to Compel Arbitration and Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Motion by Devon Curtis Beane for presentment of motion to seal #20 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION by Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. to seal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Devon Curtis Beane for presentment of Sealed motion, #18 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 12/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 18 SEALED MOTION by Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Beane, Devon)
November 26, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS Report (Joint) by Abbott Laboratories (Pearson, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Extend Time (Pearson, Michael)
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. by Devon Curtis Beane (Beane, Devon)
October 25, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. by Alan L. Barry (Barry, Alan)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 12/4/2019 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 11/26/2019. Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #7 , #8 , #9 , and #10 are granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 10/17/2019. Mailed notice (aee, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abbott Laboratories as to Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Hales, Bryan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abbott Laboratories as to Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc. on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Hales, Bryan)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16336090. (DeJulio, Nichole)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16316177. (Frank, Noah)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16307533. (Pearson, Michael)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16307469. (Locascio, Gregg)
October 4, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc., Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited, Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc. (ecw, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, )
October 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Abbott Laboratories of Claims Involving Patents (Hales, Bryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Abbott Laboratories (Hales, Bryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Abbott Laboratories by Bryan Scott Hales (Hales, Bryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hales, Bryan)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Abbott Laboratories; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16304917. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hales, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott Laboratories v. Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grifols Diagnostic Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Devon Curtis Beane
Represented By: Alan L. Barry
Represented By: Melissa Haulcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grifols Worldwide Operations Limited
Represented By: Devon Curtis Beane
Represented By: Alan L. Barry
Represented By: Melissa Haulcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Vaccines And Diagnostics, Inc.
Represented By: Devon Curtis Beane
Represented By: Alan L. Barry
Represented By: Melissa Haulcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Bryan Scott Hales
Represented By: Nichole DeJulio
Represented By: Noah S Frank
Represented By: Gregg F. Locascio
Represented By: Michael Arthur Pearson, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?