Tooley v. BRE DDR Woodfield Village LLC
Plaintiff: Dennis Tooley
Defendant: BRE DDR WOODFIELD VILLAGE LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company and BRE DDR Woodfield Village LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv06598
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #13 filed on 12/17/2019, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Status hearing set for 12/19/2019 is stricken. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dennis Tooley (Coffman, Brian)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: In view of the notice of settlement #11 filed on 11/26/2019, the status hearing set for 12/5/2019 is stricken and reset to 12/19/2019 at 9:00 a.m. If a stipulation of dismissal is filed prior to that date, the status hearing will be stricken and the case will be closed. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 SETTLEMENT Agreement Joint Notice (Coffman, Brian)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion by Defendant BRE DDR Woodfield Village, LLC for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Status hearing set for 11/20/2019 is stricken and reset to 12/5/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of motion date of 11/5/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Melissa M Hewitt for presentment of extension of time #8 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/5/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Hewitt, Melissa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant BRE DDR Woodfield Village LLC for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Hewitt, Melissa)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BRE DDR Woodfield Village LLC by Melissa M Hewitt (Hewitt, Melissa)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Dennis Tooley regarding Summons and Complaint served on BRE DDR WOODFIELD VILLAGE LLC through Registered Agent Illinois Corporation Service Company on October 15, 2019 (Coffman, Brian)
October 7, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant BRE DDR Woodfield Village LLC (jg, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 11/20/2019 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
October 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dennis Tooley by Brian W. Coffman (Coffman, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Coffman, Brian)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dennis Tooley; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16306041.(Coffman, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tooley v. BRE DDR Woodfield Village LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tooley
Represented By: Brian W. Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE DDR WOODFIELD VILLAGE LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRE DDR Woodfield Village LLC
Represented By: Melissa M Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?