Al Saeedy v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Hayder Al Saeedy
Defendant: Mike Pompeo, Acting Director of F David Bowdich, Kevin McAleenan, Mick Dedvukaj, David Bowdich and Kevin K. McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv06631
Filed: October 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 12/11/2019 at 9:00 a.m. Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2019. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mike Pompeo (Treacy, Elizabeth)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mike Pompeo (Oswald, Craig)
October 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to David Bowdich, Mick Dedvukaj, Kevin K. McAleenan, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (ng, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
October 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 6, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Hayder Al Saeedy by Mohammed W Ibrahim (Ibrahim, Mohammed)
October 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Hayder Al Saeedy; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16309887. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Ibrahim, Mohammed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al Saeedy v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director of F David Bowdich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mick Dedvukaj
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bowdich
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayder Al Saeedy
Represented By: Mohammed W Ibrahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?